Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028611

EP2028611 - System and method for representation of electronic mail users using avatars [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Vuong, Thanh Vinh
458 Activa Avenue
Kitchener, Ontario N2E 4B9 / CA
02 / Nagy, Tom
64 Roosevelt Avenue
Waterloo Ontario N2L 2N4 / CA
03 / Scott, Sherryl Lee Lorraine
1-135 Beverley St
Toronto Ontario M5T 1Y4 / CA
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Former [2009/09]Rickard, David John
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Application number, filing date07114639.320.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028611
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, H04L29/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesAL20.08.2007
BA20.08.2007
HR20.08.2007
MK20.08.2007
RS20.08.2007
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Darstellung von E-Mail-Nutzern durch Avatare[2009/09]
English:System and method for representation of electronic mail users using avatars[2009/09]
French:Système et procédé de représentation d'utilisateurs de courrier électronique utilisant des avatars[2009/09]
Examination procedure20.08.2007Examination requested  [2009/09]
08.04.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2012Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/25]
28.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/25]
28.01.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03094072  (AN HYUN-GI [KR]) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 2 * * page 7, line 6 - line 17 * * page 9, line 8 - line 18 * * page 10, line 20 - page 12, line 6 * * page 14, line 23 - page 16, line 22 * * page 18, line 3 - line 13 * * page 19, line 30 - page 20, line 28 *;
 [X]EP1549031  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * page 3, line 38 - line 53 * * page 4, line 25 - line 38 * * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 10 * * page 7, line 14 - line 41 * * page 7, line 53 - line 58 * * page 9, line 48 - line 58 * * page 11, line 55 - page 12, line 2 * * page 12, line 33 - line 48 * * page 15, line 19 - line 24 *;
 [X]EP1736931  (COMVERSE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * column 2, line 7 - line 31 * * column 4, line 26 - line 52 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 15 * * column 8, line 45 - line 56 * * column 9, line 12 - line 23 * * column 9, line 48 - line 52 * * column 10, line 8 - line 40 *
by applicantWO03094072
 EP1549031
 EP1736931