Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027875

EP2027875 - A process for isolation and purification of a target protein free of prion protein (PrPSC) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/09]A Process for Isolation and Purification of a Target Protein free of Prion Protein (PrPSC)
[2009/23]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.07.2009
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 26.08.2009  [2009/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Octapharma AG
Seidenstrasse 2
8853 Lachen / CH
[2009/09]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Patentanwälte P.O. Box 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [2009/09]Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm
Patent Attorneys Von Kreisler Selting Werner (224) Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date07114856.323.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027875
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/00, C07K14/47, G01N33/68, C07K1/16
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Isolierung und Reinigung eines prionenproteinfreien Target-Proteins[2009/09]
English:A process for isolation and purification of a target protein free of prion protein (PrPSC)[2009/23]
French:Processus d'isolation et de purification d'une protéine cible libre de protéine de prion (PrPSC)[2009/09]
Former [2009/09]A Process for Isolation and Purification of a Target Protein free of Prion Protein (PrPSC)
Examination procedure24.12.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/35]
07.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/35]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9800441  (BIOPURE CORP [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6;
 [XY]WO03105911  (COMMON SERVICES AGENCY [GB], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6;
 [Y]WO9408686  (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004024318  (CIPHERGEN BIOSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [XY]  BRIMACOMBE D B ET AL, "Characterization and polyanion-binding properties of purified recombinant prion protein", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, PORTLAND PRESS, LONDON, GB, (1999), vol. 342, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 605 - 613, XP002253306 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3420605
 [XY]  FOSTER P R ET AL, "STUDIES ON THE REMOVAL OF ABNORMAL PRION PROTEIN BY PROCESSES USED IN THE MANUFACTURE OF HUMAN PLASMA PRODUCTS", VOX SANGUINIS, S. KARGER AG, BASEL, CH, (200003), vol. 78, no. 2, ISSN 0042-9007, pages 86 - 95, XP009015791 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000031156
 [XY]  BURNOUF ET AL, "Current strategies to prevent transmission of prions by human plasma derivatives", TRANSFUSION CLINIQUE ET BIOLOGIQUE, ARNETTE-BLACKWELL, PARIS, FR, (20070201), vol. 13, no. 5, ISSN 1246-7820, pages 320 - 328, XP005869901 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tracli.2006.11.001
 [XY]  THYER J ET AL, "Prion-removal capacity of chromatographic and ethanol precipitation steps used in the production of albumin and immunoglobulins", VOX SANGUINIS, (2006), vol. 91, no. 4, ISSN 0042-9007, pages 292 - 300, XP002464418 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1423-0410.2006.00829.x
 [A]  ZEILER B ET AL, "Concentration and removal of prion proteins from biological solutions", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (200304), vol. 37, no. Pt 2, ISSN 0885-4513, pages 173 - 182, XP002324177 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BA20020087
 [A]  PAN K-M ET AL, "PURIFICATION AND PROPERTIES OF THE CELLULAR PRION PROTEIN FROM SYRIAN HAMSTER BRAIN", PROTEIN SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (1992), vol. 1, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 1343 - 1352, XP002043228 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *