blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1908450 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1908450



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 694
18.05.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
18.05.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
12.05.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
03.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.04.2017 English translation of the claims Opposition 3
03.04.2017 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
03.04.2017 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
03.04.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.01.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
19.01.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
19.01.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 5
16.01.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
10.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.01.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
23.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.12.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
22.12.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
14.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.12.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.12.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
01.12.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
18.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.08.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 2
15.08.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.08.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
11.08.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
08.08.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.08.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.06.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
03.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.03.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
27.03.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
28.11.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.11.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
25.11.2013 Claims Appeal 1
25.11.2013 Claims Appeal 2
25.11.2013 Claims Appeal 2
25.11.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.11.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
25.11.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
25.11.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
25.11.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 18
25.11.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 3
25.11.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
22.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.11.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 33
30.09.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.09.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
24.09.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.09.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
15.07.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.07.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
15.07.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.07.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
15.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.07.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.07.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 10
04.06.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.06.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
03.06.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
16.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.04.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 13
10.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
05.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
05.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
05.04.2013 Claims Opposition 3
05.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.04.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
30.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
28.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
27.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
27.03.2013 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
27.03.2013 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
23.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
24.01.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.01.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
23.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.11.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
21.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.09.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
16.05.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
02.04.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
21.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
21.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
21.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
21.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
19.03.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
19.03.2012 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
10.06.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.03.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.03.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.03.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.03.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
30.11.2010 Annex Search / examination 3
30.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
30.11.2010 Non-scannable object Search / examination 2
30.11.2010 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
30.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
19.11.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.11.2010 Annex Search / examination 3
17.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
17.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
15.11.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.11.2010 Annex Search / examination 3
10.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
10.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
14.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
14.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
14.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
14.09.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.09.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.06.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
08.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.06.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
08.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.06.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.05.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.03.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
19.11.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.11.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
07.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.03.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.03.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.05.2008 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
28.04.2008 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 2
28.04.2008 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
16.04.2008 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
14.04.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
12.03.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.02.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.02.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 2
25.02.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
06.09.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
06.09.2007 Priority document Search / examination 24
29.08.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
29.08.2007 Description Search / examination 14
29.08.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
29.08.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3