Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1857370 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1857370



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 889
17.11.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
11.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.11.2016 Cover sheet for fax transmission Appeal 1
28.10.2016 Communication about missing proof of delivery Appeal 4
29.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.09.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
26.09.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.09.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.07.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
01.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.06.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.06.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
03.06.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
02.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.05.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
26.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
31.03.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
31.03.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 16
24.03.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.03.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.11.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
03.04.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
19.11.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
24.04.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.04.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
05.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 21
05.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
05.04.2013 Claims Appeal 4
05.04.2013 Claims Appeal 1
05.04.2013 Claims Appeal 4
05.04.2013 Claims Appeal 1
05.04.2013 Claims Appeal 4
05.04.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 18
15.01.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.01.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.01.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.12.2012 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
21.12.2012 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
21.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.12.2012 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 3
03.12.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 19
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 31
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 18
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 41
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
28.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
28.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
02.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.09.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.09.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
17.09.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.09.2012 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
18.07.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
18.07.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 4
18.07.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.07.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.07.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
26.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
07.06.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.06.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
18.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.01.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 11
11.01.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
11.01.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
11.01.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.01.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Claims Opposition 3
05.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Claims Opposition 3
05.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Claims Opposition 3
05.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
04.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
04.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
04.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
04.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
04.10.2011 Claims Opposition 1
04.10.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.10.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
22.09.2011 Confirmation of the correction of a decision Opposition 1
25.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
25.07.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.07.2011 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Opposition 1
18.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.07.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
16.06.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.04.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.04.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.02.2011 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 9
24.02.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
24.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
24.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
24.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
24.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
29.04.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.04.2010 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
15.04.2010 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
15.04.2010 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
08.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Description Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
26.02.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.10.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.10.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.10.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.10.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
27.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.08.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 2
20.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
20.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
20.03.2009 Description Search / examination 10
20.03.2009 Description Search / examination 9
20.03.2009 Drawings Search / examination 1
20.03.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
19.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
19.03.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
19.03.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
19.03.2009 Description Search / examination 9
19.03.2009 Description Search / examination 10
19.03.2009 Drawings Search / examination 1
19.03.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 3
19.03.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.03.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 29
23.01.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.01.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.01.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.01.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.09.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.06.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
04.06.2008 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
19.05.2008 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.04.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.04.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 4
14.04.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
18.02.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
24.10.2007 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
24.10.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.09.2007 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.08.2007 Annex Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
29.08.2007 Description Search / examination 19
29.08.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Drawings Search / examination 3
29.08.2007 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
29.08.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
08.07.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37