blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1895648 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1895648



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 177
26.08.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.08.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.08.2009 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
17.08.2009 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
14.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.08.2009 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
07.08.2009 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
31.07.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
29.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.07.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.07.2009 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
11.05.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.02.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.02.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
12.02.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.02.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
04.02.2008 The request for correction will be decided by the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.10.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.09.2007 Claims Search / examination 9
27.09.2007 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
21.09.2007 Claims Search / examination 9
21.09.2007 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.09.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.09.2007 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
03.09.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
03.09.2007 Priority document Search / examination 69
30.08.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.08.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
30.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 9
30.08.2007 Description Search / examination 38
30.08.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2007 Drawings Search / examination 12
30.08.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3