Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1895648
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8159200Global Dossier 17.04.2012B2
US2011273151 10.11.2011A1
Priority number Date
US89288507 28.08.2007
US201113184101 15.07.2011
US61529109 10.11.2009
GB0617139 31.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7994763Global Dossier 09.08.2011B2
US2010052638 04.03.2010A1
Priority number Date
US89288507 28.08.2007
US61529109 10.11.2009
GB0617139 31.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2479445 30.11.2011B
GB2479445 12.10.2011A
GB201105775D 18.05.2011D0
Priority number Date
GB201105775 31.08.2006
GB0617139 31.08.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US7723965Global Dossier 25.05.2010B2
US2008055946 06.03.2008A1
Priority number Date
GB0617139 31.08.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1895648Global Dossier 05.03.2008A2
Priority number Date
GB0617139 31.08.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN101136590 05.03.2008A
Priority number Date
GB0617139 31.08.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2441358 06.07.2011B
GB2441358 05.03.2008A
GB0617139D 11.10.2006D0
Priority number Date
GB0617139 31.08.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW200818681 16.04.2008A
Priority number Date
GB0617139 31.08.2006