Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1857633

EP1857633 - Flow control apparatus for use in a wellbore [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.01.2012  [2012/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weatherford/Lamb, Inc.
515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston
Texas 77027 / US
[2011/04]
Former [2007/47]For all designated states
WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.
515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston
Texas 77027 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bode, Jeffrey
19 Picasso Path Place
The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US
02 / Fishbeck, Craig
32223 Willow Vreek Park
Conroe, TX 77385 / US
03 / Lembcke, Jeffrey John
13527 Kavanaugh Lane
Cypress, TX 77429 / US
 [2008/19]
Former [2007/47]01 / Bode, Jeffrey
26 Hidden Meadow Drive
The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US
02 / Fishbeck, Craig
32223 Willow Vreek Park
Conroe, TX 77385 / US
03 / Lembcke, Jeffrey John
13527 Kavanaugh Lane
Cypress, TX 77429 / US
Representative(s)Marchitelli, Mauro
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx
Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6
10123 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2007/47]Marchitelli, Mauro
c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18
10123 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date07115567.513.12.2005
[2007/47]
Priority number, dateUS2004001386316.12.2004         Original published format: US 13863
[2007/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1857633
Date:21.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1857633
Date:24.06.2009
[2009/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1857633
Date:26.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:E21B34/08, E21B43/12, E21B43/08
[2007/47]
Designated contracting statesGB [2010/09]
Former [2007/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Durchflussregelvorrichtung für den Einsatz in einer Tiefbohrung[2007/47]
English:Flow control apparatus for use in a wellbore[2007/47]
French:Dispositif de contrôle de débit pour usage dans des forages profonds[2007/47]
Examination procedure23.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/49]
28.10.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
20.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2010Fee for grant paid
17.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05112026.9  / EP1672167
Opposition(s)27.10.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200703   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2008
Documents cited:Search[AD]US6371210  (BODE JEFFREY ET AL) [AD] 1-15 * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 46 * * figures 3-7 *;
 [A]US4134454  (TAYLOR ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *