Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1901563

EP1901563 - Image display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.10.2013  [2013/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU TEN LIMITED
1-2-28 Gosho-dori, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo / JP
[2008/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Iwamoto, Shinichi
c/o Fujitsu Ten Limited 1-2-28 Gosho-dori, Hyogo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP
 [2008/12]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/12]Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date07116360.413.09.2007
[2008/12]
Priority number, dateJP2006024750813.09.2006         Original published format: JP 2006247508
[2008/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1901563
Date:19.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1901563
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/75
[2008/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/42]
Former [2008/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bildanzeigevorrichtung[2008/12]
English:Image display device[2008/12]
French:Dispositif d'affichage d'image[2008/12]
Examination procedure06.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
12.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
03.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/40]
13.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.03.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1143745  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 30,31 * * page 6, paragraph 73 - paragraph 80 * * page 7, paragraph 90 - paragraph 100 * * page 8, paragraph 112 * * figures 1,5,8,10 *;
 [X]EP0419814  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 7, line 7 - line 45 * * figures 1B,4,6 *;
 [X]EP0716541  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 6, line 54 - page 7, line 47 * * page 8, line 57 - page 9, line 13 * * page 10, line 12 - line 24 * * figures 1,4A,5,8 *