Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1906700

EP1906700 - Method for time-controlled adaptation of a hearing device and corresponding hearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/14]Method for time-controlled activation of a hearing device and corresponding hearing device
[2012/35]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sivantos GmbH
Henri-Dunant-Straße 100
91058 Erlangen / DE
[2015/45]
Former [2008/14]For all designated states
Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH
Gebbertstrasse 125
91058 Erlangen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Barthel, Roland
Görlitzer Strasse 14
91058 Erlangen / DE
02 / Bäuml, Robert
Altmühlstrasse 19
90542 Eckental / DE
03 / Fischer, Eghart
Franz-Peter-Seifert-Strasse 3a
91126 Schwabach / DE
 [2008/14]
Representative(s)FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/14]Maier, Daniel Oliver , et al
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date07117099.725.09.2007
[2008/14]
Priority number, dateDE2006104623029.09.2006         Original published format: DE102006046230
[2008/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1906700
Date:02.04.2008
Language:DE
[2008/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1906700
Date:10.08.2011
[2011/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1906700
Date:23.01.2013
Language:DE
[2013/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2008/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum zeitgesteuerten Einstellen einer Hörvorrichtung und entsprechende Hörvorrichtung[2008/14]
English:Method for time-controlled adaptation of a hearing device and corresponding hearing device[2012/35]
French:Procédé de réglage commandé dans le temps d'un dispositif auditif et dispositif auditif[2008/14]
Former [2008/14]Method for time-controlled activation of a hearing device and corresponding hearing device
Examination procedure16.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/01]
13.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2012Fee for grant paid
10.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013  28.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Oticon A/S / GN ReSound A/S
Kongebakken 9 / Lautrupbjerg 7
2765 Smørum /2750 Ballerup / DK
Opponent's representative
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
 [2019/17]
Former [2018/32]
Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013  28.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Widex A/S / Oticon A/S / GN ReSound A/S
Nymøllevej 6 / Kongebakken 9 / Lautrupbjerg 7
3540 Lynge / 2765 Smørum / 2750 Ballerup / DK
Opponent's representative
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2013/48]
Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013   
Widex A/S / Oticon A/S / GN ReSound A/S
Nymøllevej 6 / Kongebakken 9 / Lautrupbjerg 7
3540 Lynge / 2765 Smørum / 2750 Ballerup / DK
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
04.12.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.04.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.07.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.07.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition30.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1942/15
30.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
30.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
06.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.09.2007
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
AT25.09.2013
IE25.09.2013
LU25.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
AT25.09.2013
IE25.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
Former [2015/12]CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
AT25.09.2013
IE25.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
Former [2014/34]CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE25.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
Former [2014/33]CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE25.09.2013
Former [2014/20]CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2014/03]CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/52]CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/40]FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/38]FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/37]FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/36]LT23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT23.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1453357  (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * [Y] 3,6;
 [Y]WO2004114722  (GN RESOUND AS [DK], et al) [Y] 3,6 * page 6, line 9 - line 30 *;
 [A]EP1617705  (PHONAK AG [CH]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]EP1699262  (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] *;
 [A]EP0814634  (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 6, line 38 - line 56 *
by applicantUS2005129262
 EP1453357
 WO2004114722
 EP1617705
 EP1699262
 EP0814634