blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1908686

EP1908686 - Hierarchial strategy for singularity avoidance in arrays of control moment gyroscopes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.07.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.08.2010  [2010/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07960 / US
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07960 / US
Former [2008/15]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
P.O. Box 2245 101 Columbia Road
Morristown NJ 07962 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hamilton, Brian J.
7108 W. Sack Drive
Glendale, AZ 85308 / US
02 / Underhill, Brian K.
25809 N. 55th Drive
Phoenix, AZ 85085 / US
 [2008/15]
Representative(s)Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date07117311.626.09.2007
[2008/15]
Priority number, dateUS2006054045229.09.2006         Original published format: US 540452
[2008/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1908686
Date:09.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1908686
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2007
ClassificationIPC:B64G1/28, G05D1/08
[2008/15]
CPC:
B64G1/286 (EP,US); B64G1/244 (EP,US); B64G1/245 (EP,US);
Y10T74/12 (EP,US); Y10T74/1221 (EP,US); Y10T74/1229 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/51]
Former [2008/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hierarchische Strategie zur Singularitätsvermeidung in einer Steuermomentkreiselanordnung[2008/15]
English:Hierarchial strategy for singularity avoidance in arrays of control moment gyroscopes[2008/15]
French:Stratégie hiérarchique pour éviter la singularité dans des réseaux de gyroscopes inertiels à commande[2008/15]
Examination procedure26.09.2007Examination requested  [2008/15]
11.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
18.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2009Fee for grant paid
22.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006020314  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0054] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO2006085996  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - KUHNS M D; RODRIGUEZ A A, "A preferred trajectory tracking steering law for spacecraft with redundant CMGs", PROCEEDINGS OF 1995 AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE - ACC'95 21-23 JUNE 1995 SEATTLE, WA, USA, (1995), vol. 5, pages 3111 - 3115, XP002458877 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.