Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1933185

EP1933185 - Zoom lens using both a diffractive optical element and a material exhibiting extraordinary partial dispersion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2010
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-Ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2008/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Hamano, Hiroyuki
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex
UB11 1ET / GB
Former [2009/31]Sharp, Alan Cooper
Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge
UB11 1JA / GB
Former [2008/25]Sharp, Alan Cooper
Canon Europe Ltd., European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1JA / GB
Application number, filing date07118368.512.10.2007
[2008/25]
Priority number, dateJP2006033696814.12.2006         Original published format: JP 2006336968
[2008/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1933185
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1933185
Date:22.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:G02B15/173, G02B1/04, G02B27/00
[2008/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
TitleGerman:Zoomobjektiv mit einem diffraktiven optischen Element und mit einem Material mit anomaler Teildispersion[2008/25]
English:Zoom lens using both a diffractive optical element and a material exhibiting extraordinary partial dispersion[2008/25]
French:Zoom comportant à la fois un élément diffractif et un matériau à dispersion partielle extraordinaire[2008/25]
Examination procedure30.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
12.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2009Fee for grant paid
12.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CY22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IT22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
MT22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
TR22.07.2009
IE12.10.2009
LU12.10.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
HU23.01.2010
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]AT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IT22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
MT22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
IE12.10.2009
LU12.10.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
HU23.01.2010
Former [2011/22]AT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IT22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
MT22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
IE12.10.2009
LU12.10.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2011/20]AT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IT22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
IE12.10.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/27]AT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/20]AT22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/17]AT22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2006221460  (SARUWATARI HIROSHI [JP]) [Y] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0065] - [0067] - [0131] , [1353]; figure 1; example 1 * [A] 2;
 [YA]EP1659422  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1,3-5,7 * paragraphs [0042] , [0130]; figure 7; example 4 * [A] 2;
 [Y]JP2004061679  (CANON KK) [Y] 6 * figures 1,5 *