Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1870053

EP1870053 - Apparatus for obtaining an axis of an intramedullary canal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/52]Computer-assisted hip replacement surgery
[2009/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.10.2010
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orthosoft Inc.
75 Queen Street
Suite 3300
Montréal
Québec H3C 2N6 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2007/52]For all designated states
Orthosoft Inc.
75 Queen Street, Suite 3300 Montreal
Québec H3C 2N6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Jansen, Herbert, André
5127 De Bordeaux
Montréal Québec H2H 2A6 / CA
02 / Amiot, Louis-Philippe
49 Thurlow Avenue
Hampstead Québec H3X 3G8 / CA
03 / Cossette, Sébastien
1155 Avila-Desroches
Laval Québec H7L 6B9 / CA
04 / Fontaine, Isabelle
10416 Grande-Allée
Montréal Québec H3L 2M3 / CA
05 / Jutras, Sébastien
99, 11th Street
Laval, Qc H7N 1T2 / CA
06 / Odermatt, Daniel
4731 Garnier
Montréal Québec H2J 3S6 / CA
07 / Pelletier, Benoît
10361 St-Charles Avenue
Montréal Québec H2C 2L7 / CA
 [2008/20]
Former [2007/52]01 / Jansen, Herbert, André
5127 De Bordeaux
Montréal Québec H2H 2A6 / CA
02 / Amiot, Louis-Philippe
49 Thurlow Avenue
Hampstead Québec H3X 3G8 / CA
03 / Cossette, Sébastien
1155 Avila-Desroches
Laval Québec H7L 6B9 / CA
04 / Fontaine, Isabelle
10416 Grande-Allée
Montréal Québec H3L 2M3 / CA
05 / Jutras, Sébastien
7842 de Gaspé
Montréal Québec H2R 2A4 / CA
06 / Odermatt, Daniel
4731 Garnier
Montréal Québec H2J 3S6 / CA
07 / Pelletier, Benoît
10361 St-Charles Avenue
Montréal Québec H2C 2L7 / CA
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/52]Betten & Resch
Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date07118433.702.10.2003
[2007/52]
Priority number, dateUS20020415809P04.10.2002         Original published format: US 415809 P
US20030465805P28.04.2003         Original published format: US 465805 P
[2007/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1870053
Date:26.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1870053
Date:21.05.2008
[2008/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1870053
Date:23.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B19/00, A61F2/46
[2007/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/52]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung einer Achse eines intramedullären Kanals[2009/33]
English:Apparatus for obtaining an axis of an intramedullary canal[2009/33]
French:Dispositif pour l'obtention d'un axe d'un canal intramédullaire[2009/33]
Former [2007/52]Computerunterstütztes chirurgisches Verfahren zur Ersetzung einer Hüfte
Former [2007/52]Computer-assisted hip replacement surgery
Former [2007/52]Chirurgie de prothèse de hanche assistée par ordinateur
Examination procedure30.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/46]
03.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2009Fee for grant paid
09.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03757587.5  / EP1545368
Opposition(s)24.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.12.2009
BE23.12.2009
CY23.12.2009
CZ23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
EE23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IT23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
RO23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
SI23.12.2009
SK23.12.2009
TR23.12.2009
BG23.03.2010
GR24.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
HU24.06.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/42]AT23.12.2009
BE23.12.2009
CY23.12.2009
CZ23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
EE23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IT23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
RO23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
SI23.12.2009
SK23.12.2009
BG23.03.2010
GR24.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
HU24.06.2010
Former [2011/20]AT23.12.2009
BE23.12.2009
CY23.12.2009
CZ23.12.2009
DK23.12.2009
EE23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
IT23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
RO23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
SI23.12.2009
SK23.12.2009
BG23.03.2010
GR24.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2010/43]AT23.12.2009
BE23.12.2009
CZ23.12.2009
EE23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
NL23.12.2009
RO23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
SI23.12.2009
SK23.12.2009
BG23.03.2010
ES03.04.2010
PT23.04.2010
Former [2010/33]AT23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
SI23.12.2009
ES03.04.2010
Former [2010/30]AT23.12.2009
FI23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
SI23.12.2009
Former [2010/27]FI23.12.2009
SE23.12.2009
SI23.12.2009
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5806518  (MITTELSTADT BRENT D [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 37 * [Y] 2,5,6;
 [Y]US5269785  (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [Y] 2 * column 8, line 43 - line 63; figure 16 *;
 [Y]US5858020  (JOHNSON WESLEY D [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 5, line 44 - line 55 *;
 [Y]US6358253  (TORRIE PAUL A [US], et al) [Y] 6 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 11; figure 2d *;
 [A]US4519100  (WILLS ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 2-4 * column 3, line 19 - line 32 *;
 [A]US5385566  (ULLMARK GOESTA [SE]) [A] 2-4 * column 3, line 19 - line 31 *;
 [E]DE10221273  (BREHM PETER [DE]) [E] 2-4 * the whole document *