blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1933167 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1933167



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 502
25.06.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2019 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.05.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.05.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
02.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.02.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
20.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 30
04.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.11.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 20
30.11.2018 Description Search / examination 19
30.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.11.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.11.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.11.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
22.11.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 10
22.11.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 10
21.11.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 20
21.11.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
15.10.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.10.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.10.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.10.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
25.09.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
27.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.06.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
20.06.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
13.06.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.06.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.04.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
10.04.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
10.01.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.06.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 1
07.04.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.04.2014 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
21.03.2014 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
18.02.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.12.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.04.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
17.01.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
12.12.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.11.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
16.11.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.11.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 7
16.11.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
14.11.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.11.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.11.2012 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
02.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.11.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.11.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
02.11.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
02.11.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
31.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.10.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
19.03.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
16.03.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.03.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.02.2012 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.02.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
23.02.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 1
16.02.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.02.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
21.11.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.09.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
02.09.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.06.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.03.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
07.03.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
07.03.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
07.03.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
07.03.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
16.01.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.12.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.12.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 34
11.12.2008 European search report Search / examination 9
11.12.2008 General enquiry Search / examination 1
21.05.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.05.2008 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
24.04.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.04.2008 Partial European search report Search / examination 8
14.12.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
14.12.2007 Priority document Search / examination 33
14.12.2007 Priority document Search / examination 24
30.10.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.10.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
30.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
30.10.2007 Description Search / examination 19
30.10.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2007 Drawings Search / examination 7
30.10.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3