Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1921592

EP1921592 - Shoulder model for shoulder arthroscopy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arthrex, Inc.
1370 Creekside Boulevard
Naples, FL 34108-1945 / US
[2011/10]
Former [2008/20]For all designated states
Arthrex, Inc.
1370 Creekside Boulevard Naples
Florida 34108-1945 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Willobee, James A.
27108 Eldenbridge Court
Bonita Springs, FL 34135 / US
02 / Wyman, Jeffrey
712 Woodhaven Lane
Naples, FL 34108 / US
 [2008/20]
Representative(s)Long, Giorgio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]Long, Giorgio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07119978.005.11.2007
[2008/20]
Priority number, dateUS20060857195P07.11.2006         Original published format: US 857195 P
[2008/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1921592
Date:14.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1921592
Date:09.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:G09B23/28
[2008/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/20]
TitleGerman:Schultermodell zur Schulterarthroskopie[2008/20]
English:Shoulder model for shoulder arthroscopy[2008/20]
French:Modèle d'épaule pour une arthroscopie d'épaule[2008/20]
Examination procedure27.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/50]
02.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2011Fee for grant paid
25.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.12.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
HU09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
MT09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
TR09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
IE05.11.2011
LU05.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
MT09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
TR09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
IE05.11.2011
LU05.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/25]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
MT09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
IE05.11.2011
LU05.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/14]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
MT09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
IE05.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/47]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
IE05.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/33]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/29]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/11]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
Former [2011/50]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/47]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
PT11.07.2011
Former [2011/41]BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
Former [2011/38]CY09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
NL09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9820473  (UNITED SURGICAL SERVICES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * page 13, line 3 - page 19, line 28 * * figures 4-15 *;
 [A]GB2284166  (SHERMAN AARON [GB]) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1205295  (CHRU LILLE [FR], et al) [A] * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036] * * figure - *;
 [A]DE9408749U  (PAINTER JOSEF [DE]) [A] * the whole document *
by applicantGB2284166
 WO9820473