Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2061160

EP2061160 - MIMO-Eigenbeamforming without feedback of channel state information [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.04.2010
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2010  [2010/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/21]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Schneider, Daniel
c/o Stuttgart Technology Center Sony Deutschland G
70327, Stuttgart / DE
02 / Stadelmeier, Lothar
c/o Stuttgart Technology Center Sony Deutschland G
70327, Stuttgart / DE
03 / Schwager, Andreas
c/o Stuttgart Technology Center Sony Deutschland G
70327, Stuttgart / DE
 [2009/21]
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/21]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date07120679.114.11.2007
[2009/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2061160
Date:20.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/06
[2009/21]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2010/04]
Former [2009/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MIMO-Eigenbeamforming ohne Rückmeldung des Kanalstatus[2009/21]
English:MIMO-Eigenbeamforming without feedback of channel state information[2009/21]
French:Formation de faisceaux propres MIMO sans retour d'information de l'état du canal[2009/21]
Examination procedure21.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/20]
04.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004038952  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - 802 11 WORKING GROUP, "IEEE 802.11n Part 11: Wireless LAN Medium Access Control (MAC) and Physical Layer (PHY) specifications: Enhancements for Higher Throughput", IEEE P802.11N/D1.0, XX, XX, (200603), pages 119 - 125, XP002469313 [X] 1,8 * page 119, line 23 - page 120, line 13 *