Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1915893

EP1915893 - Function management system for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.02.2017  [2017/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/18]For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Falck, Peter L
2613 Saratoga Drive
Waterloo, IA 50702 / US
02 / Goodnight, Trend L
106 Carmela Drive
Hudson, IA 50643 / US
03 / Kittle, Carl E
2312 Primrose
Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US
04 / Lang, Stephen P
28075 110th Street
New Hartford, IA 50660 / US
05 / Newendorp, Bruce C
211 Sandahlwood Circle
Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US
06 / Youngblood, Michael O
409 Chateau Court
Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US
 [2016/08]
Former [2008/18]01 / Falck, Peter L
2613 Saratoga Drive
Waterloo, IA 50702 / US
02 / Goodnight, Trend L
106 Carmela Drive
Hudson, IA 50643 / US
03 / Kittle, Carl E
2312 Primrose
Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US
04 / Lang, Stephen P
28075 110th Street
New Hartford, IA 50660 / US
05 / Newendorp, Bruce C
211 Sandahlwood Circle
Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US
06 / Youngblood, Michael O
409 Chateau Court
Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US
Representative(s)Bradl, Joachim
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[2016/08]
Former [2008/18]Bradl, Joachim
Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date07120790.607.04.2000
[2008/18]
Priority number, dateUS1999029108014.04.1999         Original published format: US 291080
[2008/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1915893
Date:30.04.2008
Language:DE
[2008/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1915893
Date:24.02.2016
Language:DE
[2016/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:A01B63/111
[2015/36]
Former International [2008/18]A01B63/00, B62D49/00, E02F9/20, G05B15/02, G05B19/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT [2016/08]
Former [2008/18]DE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:Funktionsmanagementsystem für Fahrzeuge[2008/18]
English:Function management system for vehicles[2008/18]
French:Système de gestion de fonction pour véhicules[2015/41]
Former [2008/18]Système de gestion de la fonction pour vehicules
Examination procedure30.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/50]
12.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2015Fee for grant paid
15.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00107566.2  / EP1044591
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000107566) is  11.08.2005
Opposition(s)25.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
19.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
19.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
17.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
IT24.02.2016
[2016/36]
Former [2016/35]ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US5050771  (HANSON LOWELL D [US] ET AL) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 3 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,5 *;
 [X]FR2764401  (RENAULT AGRICULTURE [FR]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - page 10, line 10; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5359517  (MORIYA YUKIO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 17 *;
 [A]EP0448716  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 33 *;
 [A]GB2279774  (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4628454  (ITO KATSUMI [JP]) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]EP0838141  (NEW HOLLAND UK LTD [GB] CNH UK LTD [GB]) [A] * abstract *