Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025420

EP2025420 - Method of reducing the thickness of one-piece milling products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2013
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Hermann, Fritz
Thalhofstr. 5
86899 Landsberg / DE
02 / Wiedner, Christoph
Gaugerichtsweg 18
6832 Sulz / AT
03 / Bertram, Frank
Rippolinger Str. 5
79736 Rickenbach / DE
04 / Jackel, Frank
Gierstr. 13
52072 Aachen / DE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Wildi, Roland
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[2012/15]
Former [2009/38]Wildi, Roland
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Former [2009/08]Wildi, Roland
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Application number, filing date07121819.228.11.2007
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103855416.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007038554
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025420
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025420
Date:11.04.2012
Language:DE
[2012/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:B21B1/08, B21D5/06, B21D22/02, B21D28/26
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Dickenreduktion von einstückigem Walzgut[2009/08]
English:Method of reducing the thickness of one-piece milling products[2009/08]
French:Procédé d'amincissement de laminage d'une seule pièce[2009/08]
Examination procedure18.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
11.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.02.2012Fee for grant paid
29.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.09.2009
Opposition(s)14.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.11.2007
CY11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
MT11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
TR11.04.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
IE28.11.2012
LU28.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
MT11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
TR11.04.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
IE28.11.2012
LU28.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2014/21]CY11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
MT11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
TR11.04.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
IE28.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2013/51]CY11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
MT11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
IE28.11.2012
Former [2013/47]CY11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
IE28.11.2012
Former [2013/34]CY11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/10]CY11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/09]CY11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2012/51]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
IS11.08.2012
Former [2012/48]FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
Former [2012/47]LT11.04.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE10113610  (KOPP REINER [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 6, paragraph 42 - column 7, paragraph 45; figures 1-4 * [Y] 6-11;
 [Y]GB2017556  (WUPPERMANN GMBH THEODOR) [Y] 6-11 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 55; figures 1-26 *;
 [A]JPH10180390  (HITACHI CABLE) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH11740  (HITACHI CABLE) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE19831882