blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1890147

EP1890147 - Organic polymer particles and process for producing the same, magnetic particles for diagnostics, carboxyl group-containing particles and process for producing the same, and probe-bound particles and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  11.01.2017
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017Revocation of patentpublished on 15.02.2017  [2017/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JSR Corporation
5-6-10, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8410 / JP
[2008/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Tamori, Kouji
c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP
02 / Fukuta, Tetsuo
c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP
03 / Murata, Mitsuhiro
c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP
04 / Ueno, Masaru
c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP
05 / Katayose, Satoshi
c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP
06 / Takamoto, Eiji
c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP
07 / Kasai, Kiyoshi
c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 104-8410 / JP
 [2008/08]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/08]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date07121917.412.10.2006
[2008/08]
Priority number, dateJP2005031806501.11.2005         Original published format: JP 2005318065
JP2006001599425.01.2006         Original published format: JP 2006015994
JP2006004894724.02.2006         Original published format: JP 2006048947
JP2006007608520.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006076085
JP2006008504027.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006085040
[2008/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1890147
Date:20.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1890147
Date:27.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.2008
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/543
[2008/08]
CPC:
G01N33/54326 (EP,US); C08F220/26 (EP,US); C08F220/325 (EP,US);
C08F257/02 (EP,US); C08F265/04 (EP,US); C08F291/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/36 (EP,US); C08F8/42 (EP,US); C08F8/44 (EP,US);
C08L33/066 (EP,US); C08L51/003 (EP,US); G01N33/5434 (EP,US);
H01F1/0054 (EP,US); C08F222/102 (EP,US); C08F222/103 (EP,US);
C08F2810/20 (EP,US); C08L25/04 (EP,US); Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08F8/36, C08F257/02 (US,EP);
C08F8/42, C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08F8/44, C08F8/12, C08F220/14 (US);
C08F8/44, C08F8/12, C08F220/325 (US,EP);
C08L33/066, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08F212/08, C08F212/36 (EP,US);
C08F220/14, C08F220/281, C08F222/103 (US,EP);
C08F220/14, C08F222/103, C08F220/325 (EP,US);
C08F220/325, C08F220/1804, C08F222/102 (EP,US);
C08F257/02, C08F220/282 (US,EP)
(-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/44]
Former [2008/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Organische Polymerpartikel und Herstellungsverfahren dafür, magnetische Partikel zur Diagnose, Partikel mit einer Carboxylgruppe und Herstellungsverfahren dafür sowie sondengebundene Partikel und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2008/08]
English:Organic polymer particles and process for producing the same, magnetic particles for diagnostics, carboxyl group-containing particles and process for producing the same, and probe-bound particles and process for producing the same[2008/08]
French:Particules de polymère organique et leur processus de production, particules magnétiques pour diagnostics, particules contenant un groupe de carboxyl et leur processus de production, et particules à liaison de sonde et leur processus de production[2008/08]
Examination procedure04.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/16]
03.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2009Fee for grant paid
11.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06122165.1  / EP1780544
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.10.2010  04.11.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Life Technologies Corporation
5791 Van Allen Way
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
Opponent's representative
Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 [2016/31]
Former [2010/48]
Opponent(s)01  27.10.2010   
Life Technologies Corporation
5791 Van Allen Way
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
Opponent's representative
Couchman, Jonathan Hugh
Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds
LS2 8DD / GB
02.12.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.04.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
22.02.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.02.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.07.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/07]
14.12.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition02.05.2013Appeal received No.  T0964/13
03.07.2013Statement of grounds filed
08.12.2016Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
22.04.2013Appeal received No.  T0964/13
20.06.2013Statement of grounds filed
08.12.2016Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
26.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
19.08.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1036836  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * example 1 *;
 [A]US2005119761  (MATSUMOTO TOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1-12* claim 6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.