Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1931040

EP1931040 - Electronic apparatus and electronic system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU TEN LIMITED
2-28 Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 652-8510 / JP
[2008/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Itoh, Yuusuke@c/o FUJITSU TEN LIMITED
2-28, Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 652-8510 / JP
 [2016/15]
Former [2008/24]01 / Itoh, Yuusuke c/o FUJITSU TEN LIMITED
2-28, Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 652-8510 / JP
Representative(s)Ward, James Norman , et al
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Bürkleinstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/15]Ward, James Norman
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [2008/24]Ward, James Norman
HASELTINE LAKE 5th Floor, Lincoln House 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date07122196.404.12.2007
[2008/24]
Priority number, dateJP2006032766304.12.2006         Original published format: JP 2006327663
JP2006032766404.12.2006         Original published format: JP 2006327664
JP2006032766504.12.2006         Original published format: JP 2006327665
US2006064562927.12.2006         Original published format: US 645629
US2006064564227.12.2006         Original published format: US 645642
US2006064562827.12.2006         Original published format: US 645628
US2006064567227.12.2006         Original published format: US 645672
US2006064653928.12.2006         Original published format: US 646539
US2006064647728.12.2006         Original published format: US 646477
US2006064655728.12.2006         Original published format: US 646557
US2006064647828.12.2006         Original published format: US 646478
US2006064655828.12.2006         Original published format: US 646558
US2006064649828.12.2006         Original published format: US 646498
US2006064653828.12.2006         Original published format: US 646538
US2006064647928.12.2006         Original published format: US 646479
[2008/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1931040
Date:11.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1931040
Date:10.12.2008
[2008/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1931040
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/08
[2008/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2016/15]
Former [2009/34]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2008/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektronische Vorrichtung und elektronisches System[2008/24]
English:Electronic apparatus and electronic system[2008/24]
French:Appareil et système électronique[2008/24]
Examination procedure15.04.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/29]
08.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
05.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.04.2015
20.04.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
23.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.02.2016Fee for grant paid
29.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.01.2012
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
31.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB04.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
[2018/01]
Former [2017/50]FR02.01.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US5510957  (TAKAGI KATSUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, lines 25-36 * * column 4, line 39 - column 10, line 39 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]EP0658011  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * abstract * * column 5, lines 12-46 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 6 * * figures 1-10 *;
 [X]EP1251034  (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0038] * * figures 1-5 *
ExaminationGB2314448
by applicantUS5510957
 EP0658011
 EP1251034