Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1927598

EP1927598 - CODON OPTIMISED RECOMBINANT DERMAPHAGOIDES ALLERGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/23]Vaccine
[2008/32]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.04.2009
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.05.2009  [2009/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[2008/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Bollen, Alex, Uni. Libre de Bruxelles, Ins. de Bio. et de Med. Moleculaires
Rue des Professeurs Jeener et Brachet 12
B-6041, Gosselies / BE
02 / Jacobs, Paul, Uni. Libre de Bruxelles, Faculté des Sciences
Avenue F. Roosevelt
B-1050, Bruxelles / BE
03 / Jacquet, Alain, Uni. Libre de Bruxelles, Ins. de Bio. et de Med. Moleculaires
Rue des Professeurs Jeener et Brachet 12
B-6041, Gosselies / BE
04 / Massaer Marc Georges Francis, Uni. Libre de Bruxelles, Faculté des Sciences
Avenue F. Roosevelt
B-1050, Bruxelles / BE
 [2008/23]
Representative(s)Elmhirst, Elizabeth Lucy , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/23]Elmhirst, Elizabeth Lucy , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9 25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex
TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date07122676.507.06.2001
[2008/23]
Priority number, dateGB2000001428810.06.2000         Original published format: GB 0014288
[2008/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1927598
Date:04.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/435, A61K39/35, C12N15/85
[2008/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2008/23]
TitleGerman:Codon-optimierte Nukleinsäuren codierend für Allergene aus Hausstaubmilben (Dermatophagoides sp.)[2008/32]
English:CODON OPTIMISED RECOMBINANT DERMAPHAGOIDES ALLERGENS[2008/32]
French:Polynucleotides optimisées au niveau des codons codant des allergenes des acariens de la poussiere (Dermatophagoides sp.)[2008/32]
Former [2008/23]Impfstoff
Former [2008/23]Vaccine
Former [2008/23]Vaccin
Examination procedure07.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/23]
05.12.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/22]
14.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/22]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01962721.5  / EP1315746
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[DY]WO9925823  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG ;BOLLEN ALEX (BE); JACOBS PAUL (BE); BRU) [DY] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO9731115  (DAVIES MARY ELLEN ;PERRY HELEN C (US); SHIVER JOHN W (US); FREED D) [DY] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - ANDRE S ET AL, "INCREASED IMMUNE RESPONSE ELICITED BY DNA VACCINATION WITH A SYNTHETIC GP120 SEQUENCE WITH OPTIMIZED CODON USAGE", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19980201), vol. 72, no. 2, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1497 - 1503, XP002073767 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - T-T YANG ET AL, "Optimized codon usage and chromophore mutations provide enhanced sensitivity with the green fluorescent protein", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1996), vol. 24, no. 22, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4592 - 4593, XP002120084 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.22.4592
 [Y]  - KIM C H ET AL, "Codon optimization for high-level expression of human erythropoietin (EPO) in mammalian cells", GENE: AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (19971015), vol. 199, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 293 - 301, XP004126394 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00384-3
 [Y]  - KAWAMOTO S ET AL, "Cloning and expression of Der f 6, a serine protease allergen from the house dust mite, Dermatophagoides farinae", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR BASIS OF DISEASE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990707), vol. 1454, no. 2, ISSN 0925-4439, pages 201 - 207, XP004276881 [Y] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4439(99)00041-1
by applicantWO9925823
 US6077518
 US6132734
 US5973132
 US5958415
 US5876722
 WO9731115
 WO9748370
 WO9834640
 US5697901
    - ZHOU, J. VIROL, (1999), vol. 73, pages 4972 - 4982
    - "Vaccine Design - The Subunit and Adjuvant Approach", Pharmaceutical Biotechnology, PLENUM PRESS, (1995), vol. 6
    - NAKAMURA, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 24, pages 214 - 215
    - VERME ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, pages 239 - 242
    - R. S. HALE; G THOMPSON, PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (1998), vol. 12, pages 185 - 188
    - PLATT-MILLS; CHAPMAN, J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1987), vol. 80, pages 755 - 775
    - CHAPMAN ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1983), vol. 72, pages 27 - 33
    - KRILLIS ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1984), vol. 74, pages 132 - 141
    - SHAKIB ET AL., IMMUNOL TODAY, (1998), vol. 19, pages 313 - 316
    - GOUCH ET AL., J EXP MED, (1999), vol. 12, pages 1897 - 1901
    - CHUA K ET AL., J EXP MED, (1988), vol. 167, pages 175 - 182
    - CHUA ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 101, pages 364 - 368
    - CHAPMAN; PLATTS-MILLS, J IMMUNOL, (1980), vol. 125, pages 587 - 592
    - CHAPMAN ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 113, pages 102 - 104
    - GREENE ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 147, pages 3768 - 3773
    - CHUA ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 89, pages 95 - 102
    - SCOBIE ET AL., BIOCHEM SOC TRANS, (1994), vol. 22, page 448
    - JACQUET ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2000), vol. 30, pages 677 - 684
    - SHARP; LI, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1987), vol. 15, pages 1281 - 1295
    - "Codon usage and frequency of codon occurrence", CHERRY M, Current protocols in molecular biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1992), pages A1.8 - A1.9
    - COCKETT ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, pages 662 - 667
    - JEANNIN ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 30, pages 1511 - 18
    - PALERMO ET AL., J BIOTECHNOL, (1991), vol. 19, pages 35 - 47
    - CHAMBERS ET AL., BIOCHEM SOC TRANS, (1997), vol. 25, page 85S
    - SCHULZ ET AL., MOL PATHOL, (1998), vol. 51, pages 222 - 224
    - "Heterologous expression of genes in mammalian cells", HAUSER H, Mammalian cell biotechnology in protein production, DE GRUYTER, (1997), page 27
    - HOLM L, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1986), vol. 14, pages 3075 - 3087
    - HAAS ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 6, pages 315 - 324
    - ZHOU ET AL., J VIROL, (1999), vol. 73, pages 4972 - 4982
    - ZUR MEGEDE ET AL., J VIROL, (2000), vol. 74, pages 2628 - 2635
    - SMITH D, BIOTECHNOL PROG, (1996), vol. 12, pages 417 - 422
    - KLEBER-JANKE; BECKER, PROT EXPR PURIF, (2000), vol. 19, pages 419 - 424
    - BOND ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 30, pages 1529 - 1541
    - TAKAHASHI ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 122, pages 108 - 114
    - MITA ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2000), vol. 30, pages 1582 - 1590