Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1935331

EP1935331 - Process for the preparation of modified electrodes, electrodes prepared with said process, and enzymatic biosensors comprising said electrodes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A. MENARINI INDUSTRIE FARMACEUTICHE RIUNITE S.R.L.
Via Sette Santi 3
50131 Firenze / IT
[2013/32]
Former [2008/26]For all designated states
A. MENARINI INDUSTRIE FARMACEUTICHE RIUNITE S.R.L.
Via Sette Santi 3
I-50131 Firenze / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Palleschi, Giuseppe
Via Scarlatti 4
00198 Roma / IT
02 / Ricci, Francesco
Via Monte Conero 7
00141 Roma / IT
03 / Moscone, Danila
Via Bettino Ricasoli 1
04022 Fondi / IT
04 / Poscia, Alessandro
Via Vecchia Aretina 82/5
50067 Rignano Sull'Arno / IT
 [2013/30]
Former [2008/26]01 / Palleschi, Giuseppe
Via Scarlatti 4
00198 Roma / IT
02 / Ricci, Francesco
Via Monte Conero 7
00141 Roma / IT
03 / Moscone, Danila
Via Bettino Ricasoli 1
04022 Fondi / IT
04 / Poscia, Alessandro
ViaVecchia Aretina 82/5
50067 Rignano Sull'Arno / IT
Representative(s)Gervasi, Gemma , et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[2015/37]
Former [2009/40]Gervasi, Gemma , et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2008/26]Gervasi, Gemma , et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07122884.511.12.2007
[2008/26]
Priority number, dateIT2006FI0032213.12.2006         Original published format: IT FI20060322
[2008/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1935331
Date:25.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1935331
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1935331
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:C23C18/16, C23C18/12, A61B5/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/54, G01N33/543
[2015/15]
Former International [2013/48]A61B5/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/54, C23C18/16, G01N33/543
Former International [2008/26]A61B5/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/54, C23C18/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/37]
Former [2008/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL28.03.2014
BA28.03.2014
HR28.03.2014
MK28.03.2014
RS28.03.2014
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung modifizierter Elektroden, danach hergestellte Elektroden und enzymatische Biosensoren mit diesen Elektroden[2008/26]
English:Process for the preparation of modified electrodes, electrodes prepared with said process, and enzymatic biosensors comprising said electrodes[2008/26]
French:Processus de préparation d'électrodes modifiées, électrodes préparées avec ce processus, et biocapteurs enzymatiques comportant ces électrodes[2008/26]
Examination procedure28.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/19]
30.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2015Fee for grant paid
29.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2014
Opposition(s)10.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
09.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[IY]US4859306  (SIDDIQI IQBAL [CH], et al) [I] 17 * column 4, line 17 - line 39 * [Y] 18;
 [A]US2004045821  (CUI GANG [CN], et al) [A] 22 * example 1 *
 [XAI]  IVANILDO LUIZ DE MATTOS ET AL, "Sensor and biosensor based on Prussian Blue modified gold and platinum screen printed electrodes", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, (200303), vol. 18, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/S0956-5663(02)00185-9, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 193 - 200, XP055082440 [X] 17,19-21 * 3.1. Electrodeposition and activation of PB film * [A] 1-16 [I] 22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(02)00185-9
    [XDAYI] RICCI F ET AL, "PRUSSIAN BLUE BASED SCREEN PRINTED BIOSENSORS WITH IMPROVED CHARACTERISTICS OF LONG-TERM LIFETIME AND PH STABILITY", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (200303), vol. 18, no. 2/03, doi:10.1016/S0956-5663(02)00169-0, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 165 - 174, XP001153799 [XD] 17,19-21 * 2.5. Prussian Blue deposition * [A] 1-16 [Y] 18 [I] 22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(02)00169-0
 [A]  RICCI F ET AL, "Sensor and biosensor preparation, optimisation and applications of Prussian Blue modified electrodes", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 21, no. 3, ISSN 0956-5663, (20050915), pages 389 - 407, (20050915), XP027619410 [A] 1-22 * 3.3 PB deposition procedures *
 [A]  R. VITTAL, "Surfactant Promoted Enhancement in Electrochemical and Electrochromic Properties of Films of Prussian Blue and Its Analogs", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1999), vol. 146, no. 2, doi:10.1149/1.1391682, ISSN 0013-4651, page 786, XP055081800 [A] 1-22 * Experimental *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1391682
by applicantUS5876581
    RICCI ET AL., BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, (2003), vol. 18, pages 165 - 174,