blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1935331 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1935331



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 189
13.07.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.09.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
29.07.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
29.07.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
01.04.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.04.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.04.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
01.04.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
03.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
03.03.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
03.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.10.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.10.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.07.2014 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
30.06.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
30.06.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
30.06.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
30.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
08.01.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.12.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 6
02.12.2013 European search report Search / examination 5
20.11.2013 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
07.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.10.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
24.10.2013 Partial European search report Search / examination 5
30.09.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
19.06.2013 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.08.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
28.05.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.03.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
18.03.2008 Priority document Search / examination 31
25.01.2008 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.12.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
11.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
11.12.2007 Description Search / examination 12
11.12.2007 Drawings Search / examination 4
11.12.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4