blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1935331


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.07.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
07.08.2015 (Expected) grant published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
01.08.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.04.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.03.2015 Change - classification published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
06.03.2015 Change - classification published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
04.03.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.10.2014 First examination report
01.08.2014 Definitive list of designations published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
03.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
04.04.2014 Request for examination filed published on  07.05.2014  [2014/19]
04.04.2014 Change - designated states published on  07.05.2014  [2014/19]
04.04.2014 Change - extension states published on  07.05.2014  [2014/19]
02.04.2014 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
29.11.2013 Publication of search report published on  01.01.2014  [2014/01]
29.11.2013 Change - classification published on  01.01.2014  [2014/01]
29.11.2013 Change - classification published on  01.01.2014  [2014/01]
13.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.10.2013 Change - classification published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
25.10.2013 Change - classification published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
05.07.2013 Change - applicant published on  07.08.2013  [2013/32]
21.06.2013 Change - inventor published on  24.07.2013  [2013/30]
16.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.12.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.08.2009 Change - representative published on  30.09.2009  [2009/40]
23.05.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.06.2008  [2008/26]