blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1935331
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013001102Global Dossier 03.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
US216807 13.12.2007
US201213609371 11.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1117023T 05.04.2017T1
Priority number Date
EP07122884 11.12.2007
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20151244T 29.01.2016T1
Priority number Date
EP07122884 11.12.2007
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ME02268 28.04.2016B
Priority number Date
EP07122884 11.12.2007
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI1935331T 29.04.2016T1
Priority number Date
EP07122884 11.12.2007
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8309362Global Dossier 13.11.2012B2
US2008160625 03.07.2008A1
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1935331Global Dossier 09.09.2015B1
EP1935331 01.01.2014A3
EP1935331 25.06.2008A2
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK1935331T 14.12.2015T3
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2555313T 30.12.2015T3
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE026692T 28.07.2016T2
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITFI20060322 14.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1935331E 11.01.2016E
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RS54399 28.04.2016B1
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2442130 10.02.2012C2
RU2007146458 20.06.2009A
Priority number Date
ITFI20060322 13.12.2006