Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2070454

EP2070454 - Beverage production machines comprising a plurality of core units [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/25]Modular manufacturing of beverage production machines
[2014/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2009/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Kräuchi, Frank
rue des Saugettes 10c
1417 Epautheyres / CH
02 / Ozanne, Matthieu
Au jordil 31
1846 Chessel / CH
03 / Käser, Stefan
Goldernstrasse 6
5000 Aarau / CH
04 / Schenk, Rudolf
Mühleweg 6
3510 Konolfingen / CH
05 / Piai, Guido
Dauthendeystrasse 26
81377 München / DE
06 / Kreitmayr, Bernhard
Wolfsberg 26B
85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE
07 / Georgiev, Dimitar
Flaschenträgerstr. 13
81927 München / DE
 [2009/25]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2015/29]
Former [2009/25]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date07123009.812.12.2007
[2009/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2070454
Date:17.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2070454
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/44, // A47J36/34
[2009/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2009/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Modulare Herstellung von Getränkeherstellungsmaschinen[2015/09]
English:Beverage production machines comprising a plurality of core units[2014/37]
French:Fabrication modulaire de machines de production de boissons[2015/09]
Former [2009/25]Modulare Herstellung von Getränkeherstellungsmaschinen
Former [2009/25]Modular manufacturing of beverage production machines
Former [2009/25]Fabrication modulaire de machines de production de boissons
Examination procedure30.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
29.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2015Fee for grant paid
29.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2009
Opposition(s)18.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2007
AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
BG15.07.2015
CY15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
MT15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
TR15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
GB12.12.2015
IE12.12.2015
LU12.12.2015
[2017/45]
Former [2017/39]HU12.12.2007
AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
BG15.07.2015
CY15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
MT15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
TR15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
GB12.12.2015
IE12.12.2015
LU12.12.2015
Former [2017/03]AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
GB12.12.2015
IE12.12.2015
LU12.12.2015
Former [2016/47]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
GB12.12.2015
IE12.12.2015
LU12.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
IE12.12.2015
LU12.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
LU12.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
LU12.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/31]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT15.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1864598  (NESTEC SA [CH]) [E] 1-8 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0009] - [0019] *;
 [X]WO02059534  (LANCER PARTNERSHIP LTD [US]) [X] 10,16-22 * abstract * * figures 5-10 * * page 3, lines 25-31 *;
 [X]US2003070555  (REYHANLOO SHAHRYAR [CH]) [X] 10,16 * claim 6 *;
 [A]US6029562  (SINTCHAK IVAN [US]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,6 * * column 4, lines 3-10 * * column 5, lines 10-15 *;
 [A]GB2421423  (PAYN ROGER [GB]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * * abstract *;
 [A]FR2440720  (ESSEGIELLE SRL [IT]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * * abstract *
ExaminationES278803U
by applicantFR2554185
 WO2007141334
 US2004015263
 EP1859713
 EP1798457
 WO2006050900