Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1895501

EP1895501 - Image processing apparatus and image processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.05.2011
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2015/16]
Former [2008/10]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kurose, Yoshikazu
SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 KONAN
MINATO-KU, TOKYO 108-0075 / JP
 [2015/11]
Former [2008/10]01 / Kurose, Yoshikazu
SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-Chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/10]Thévenet, Jean-Bruno , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date07123060.106.04.1999
[2008/10]
Priority number, dateJP1998009184403.04.1998         Original published format: JP 9184498
JP1999005179526.02.1999         Original published format: JP 5179599
[2008/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1895501
Date:05.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1895501
Date:28.04.2010
[2010/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/393
[2008/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/10]
TitleGerman:Bildverarbeitungsgerät und Bildverarbeitungsverfahren[2008/10]
English:Image processing apparatus and image processing method[2008/10]
French:Appareil et procédé de traitement d'images[2008/10]
Examination procedure12.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/47]
09.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
03.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination17.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0862/15
13.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
30.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99400838.1  / EP0947978
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990400838) is  05.09.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 19
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 20
Documents cited:Search[I]US5727192  (BALDWIN DAVID ROBERT [GB]) [I] 1-11 * column 7, lines 36-51 * * column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 4 * * column 31, line 2 - column 32, line 2 * * figures 2A-C *;
 [A]JPH08235130  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *;
 [AP]US5838985  (OHKI MITSUHARU [JP]) [AP] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 19 * * column 4, lines 26-59 * * column 5, lines 39-48 * * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 12 * * column 9, lines 37-44 *;
 [A]EP0638858  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 4, line 51 - page 5, line 12 *;
 [A]JPH06309349  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] - [0037] *