blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1900426

EP1900426 - Chemo-mechanically surface modified particles and their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bühler PARTEC GmbH
Science Park 2
66123 Saarbrücken / DE
[2008/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Adam, Jens
Institut für neue Matrialien GmbH Am Wilhelmsbrunnen 5
66130 Saarbrücken / DE
02 / Gossmann, Kai
Institut für neue Matrialien GmbH Hauptstrasse 173
66128 Saarbrücken / DE
03 / Schmidt, Helmut
Institut für neue Matrialien GmbH Im Königsfeld 29
66130 Saarbrücken / DE
04 / Schmitt, Karl-Peter
Institut für neue Matrialien GmbH 24, Rue de la Chapelle
57520 Grosbliederstrof / FR
05 / Tabellion, Frank
Bühler Partec GmbH Grossherzog-Friedrich-Strasse 111a
66121 Saarbrücken / DE
 [2008/12]
Representative(s)Barz, Peter, et al
Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/18]Barz, Peter, et al
Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2
80803 München / DE
Former [2008/12]Frommhold, Joachim
Bühler AG Patentabteilung
9240 Uzwil / CH
Application number, filing date07123088.206.02.2004
[2008/12]
Priority number, dateDE200310484906.02.2003         Original published format: DE 10304849
[2008/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1900426
Date:19.03.2008
Language:DE
[2008/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1900426
Date:19.11.2008
[2008/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2008
ClassificationIPC:B01J13/00
[2008/12]
CPC:
C09C1/407 (EP,US); B01J13/00 (KR); B01J13/0086 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US); C04B35/00 (KR); C04B35/62615 (EP,US);
C04B35/62655 (EP,US); C04B35/628 (EP,US); C04B35/62886 (EP,US);
C04B35/632 (EP,US); C09C1/3623 (EP,US); C09C1/3684 (EP,US);
C09C1/3692 (EP,US); C09C3/006 (EP,US); C09C3/041 (EP,US);
C09C3/08 (EP,US); C09C3/12 (EP,US); C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US); C01P2006/12 (EP,US); C04B2235/349 (EP,US);
C04B2235/483 (EP,US); C04B2235/5409 (EP,US); C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US); C04B2235/5454 (EP,US); Y10S516/924 (EP,US);
Y10S516/928 (EP,US); Y10S977/776 (EP,US); Y10T428/2982 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/12]
TitleGerman:Chemomechanisch oberflächenmodifizierte Partikel und deren Herstellung[2008/12]
English:Chemo-mechanically surface modified particles and their manufacture[2008/12]
French:Particules avec modification chimico-mécanique de surfaces et leur fabrication[2008/12]
Examination procedure04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/03]
23.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
08.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/06]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04708754.9  / EP1592503
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040708754) is  14.04.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200906   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19840527  (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 6 * * column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 29 * * column 9, line 36 - line 37 * * column 9, line 55 - line 56 * * column 10, lines 3,7,8 *;
 [X]WO0208124  (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 29 * * page 7, line 1 - line 10 * * page 7, line 28 * * examples 2,3 *;
 [X]DE19849048  (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 14 * * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 19 * * column 11, line 33 - line 36 * * column 11, line 67 - column 12, line 1 * * column 12, line 23 - line 24 *;
 [X]WO0014017  (INST NEUE MATERIALEN GEM GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 13, line 21 - page 14, line 17 * * page 19, line 29 - page 20, line 3 * * page 20, line 21 - page 21, line 2 * * page 23, line 9 - line 30 *;
 [X]DE19952040  (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE]) [X] 14,15 * column 8, line 31 - column 13, line 65 *;
 [X]WO9321127  (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 14,15 * claim 10 * * page 7, line 23 - line 29 *
by applicantWO9221729
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.