Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1906671

EP1906671 - Moving picture encoding method and decoding method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.10.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1
c/o Sakura Sogo Jimusho
1-11 Kanda Jimbocho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0051 / JP
[2015/33]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue
Suite 200
Torrance CA 90503 / US
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2008/14]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Abe, Kiyofumi
c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / Kadono, Shinya
c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / Kondo, Satoshi
c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / Hagai, Makoto
c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2008/14]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2008/14]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date07123844.822.07.2003
[2008/14]
Priority number, dateJP2002023216008.08.2002         Original published format: JP 2002232160
JP2002027399219.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002273992
JP2002028929401.10.2002         Original published format: JP 2002289294
JP2002029672609.10.2002         Original published format: JP 2002296726
JP2002037072220.12.2002         Original published format: JP 2002370722
JP2003000875116.01.2003         Original published format: JP 2003008751
[2008/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1906671
Date:02.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1906671
Date:10.03.2010
[2010/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/26, H04N7/36, H04N7/46, H04N7/50
[2008/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/14]
TitleGerman:Verschlüsselungsverfahren für bewegte Bilder und Entschlüsselungsverfahren[2008/14]
English:Moving picture encoding method and decoding method[2008/14]
French:Procédé de codage d'images en mouvement et procédé de décodage[2008/14]
Examination procedure09.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/42]
07.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
30.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination19.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0110/15
19.12.2014Statement of grounds filed
10.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03741520.5  / EP1530374
Divisional application(s)EP14197718.1  / EP2903272
EP14197723.1  / EP2928185
EP14197725.6  / EP2903277
EP14197727.2  / EP2903278
EP17188103.0  / EP3285486
EP17188120.4  / EP3288261
EP18155299.3  / EP3349447
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030741520) is  13.03.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[X]  - THOMAS WIEGAND, "DRAFT ISO/IEC 14496-10 : 2002 (E)", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), (20020510), no. JVT-C167, pages I,38-40,99 - 106, XP002565253 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KIKUCHI, "Multiframe MC using frame interpolation", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), (20020201), no. JVT-B075, pages 1 - 8, XP030005075 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TSUHAN CHEN ET AL, "A new frame interpolation scheme for talking head sequences", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. (ICIP). WASHINGTON, OCT. 23 - 26, 1995; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. (ICIP)], LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19951023), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-3122-8, pages 591 - 594, XP010197038 [A] 1-5 * page 591 - page 592, paragraphs 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1995.537548
by applicant   - M.M. HANNUKSELA, "Generalized B/MH-Picture Averaging", 3RD JVT MEETING, JVT-C0077, JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG (ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q.6