Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1970131

EP1970131 - Mail sorting and sequencing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.08.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELSAG DATAMAT S.p.A.
Via Giacomo Puccini 2
16154 Genova / IT
[2008/38]
Inventor(s)01 / De Leo, Guido
Via Napoli, 57/3
16134 Genova / IT
02 / Franzone, Cristiano
Via Mascagni, 60
16154 Genova / IT
 [2010/36]
Former [2008/38]01 / De Leo, Guido
Via Napoli, 57/3
16134, GENOVA / IT
02 / Franzone, Cristiano
Via Mascagni, 60
16154, GENOVA / IT
Representative(s)Bergadano, Mirko , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2013/23]
Former [2008/38]Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date07150496.323.07.2004
[2008/38]
Priority number, dateIT2003TO0057725.07.2003         Original published format: IT TO20030577
[2008/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1970131
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1970131
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:B07C3/08
[2008/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/38]
TitleGerman:System zum Sortieren und zur Reihenfolgeplanung von Postsendungen[2008/38]
English:Mail sorting and sequencing system[2008/38]
French:Système de tri et de mise en séquence du courrier[2008/38]
Examination procedure19.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
22.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2010Fee for grant paid
26.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04103554.4  / EP1500440
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011  12.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2011/29]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011   
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
CT IP Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
80200 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
19.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.09.2013Date of oral proceedings
27.09.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
14.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.01.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition19.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0418/15
21.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
05.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB23.07.2013
IT23.07.2013
[2018/17]
Former [2014/24]GB23.07.2013
IT23.07.2013
Former [2014/21]GB23.07.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US4310276  (CASTAGNOLI GUISEPPE) [X] 1-19 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO0110574  (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC ; BONNET HENRI (US)) [X] 1-19 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5362040  (ROCH JEAN ET AL) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 9 - column 3, line 6; figure 1 *