Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1936704

EP1936704 - Semiconductor light emitting device package [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/26]Semiconductor light emitting device package and method for manufacturing the same
[2018/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-Dong
Yongdungpo-Gu
Seoul / KR
For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu
Seoul, 04637 / KR
[2018/40]
Former [2017/20]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-Dong
Yongdungpo-Gu
Seoul / KR
For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu
Seoul, 04637 / KR
Former [2008/26]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-Gu
Seoul / KR
For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Geun Ho
3-402 Saerom Apt., 164-12 Poi-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Lee, Seung Yeob
402 Jeongseck Green Apt.
2970-71 Jung-dong, Jungwon-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Won, Yu Ho
109-1601 Doosan Apt., Guro 4-dong
Guro-gu, Seoul / KR
 [2018/21]
Former [2008/26]01 / Kim, Geun Ho
3-402 Saerom Apt., 164-12 Poi-dong Gangnam-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Lee, Seung Yeob, 402 Jeongseok Green Apt.
2970-71 Jung-dong, Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Won, Yu Ho
109-1601 Doosan Apt., Guro 4-dong
Guro-gu, Seoul / KR
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2018/40]
Former [2013/08]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2008/26]Camp, Ronald , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date07250477.206.02.2007
[2008/26]
Priority number, dateKR2006013173221.12.2006         Original published format: KR 20060131732
[2008/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1936704
Date:25.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1936704
Date:04.08.2010
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1936704
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/00, // H01L25/16
[2008/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/40]
Former [2008/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Baugruppe für eine lichtemittierende Halbleitervorrichtung[2018/17]
English:Semiconductor light emitting device package[2018/17]
French:Paquet de dispositif électroluminescent à semiconducteur[2018/17]
Former [2008/26]Baugruppe für eine lichtemittierende Halbleitervorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung
Former [2008/26]Semiconductor light emitting device package and method for manufacturing the same
Former [2008/26]Paquet de dispositif électroluminescent à semiconducteur et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure04.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/40]
22.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2011Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
25.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2018Fee for grant paid
24.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination31.01.2012Appeal received No.  T1040/12
17.02.2012Statement of grounds filed
26.09.2017Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
26.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2010
Opposition(s)04.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
04.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
15.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
17.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
24.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
23.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SI03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
IE06.02.2019
LU06.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/04]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SI03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
LU06.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
Former [2019/50]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SI03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
LU06.02.2019
Former [2019/47]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
LU06.02.2019
Former [2019/45]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/40]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/22]CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT03.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2006054910  (TAKEMORI HIDEAKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,12-16 * figures 3-6 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0058] * [Y] 6,9-11;
 [XI]US2005121686  (KELLER BERND [US] ET AL) [X] 18 * paragraphs [0033] , [0039] - [0041] - [0048]; figures 2,5 * [I] 1,3,7,17,19,21;
 [Y]JPH1146018  (CITIZEN ELECTRON CO LTD) [Y] 6 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2004319939  (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 9,10 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2006245188  (TAKENAKA YASUJI [JP]) [Y] 11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1603170  (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]; SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS [JP]) [A] 7,18 * paragraph [0108]; figure 24 *;
 [A]WO2006054616  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; TANIMOTO NORIYASU; OBARA KUNIHIKO) [A] 7,18 * paragraph [0071]; figure 7 *
ExaminationUS2004217369