Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1970835

EP1970835 - Method and apparatus for secure web browsing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2014
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2014  [2014/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.
600-700 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
[2013/13]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Lucent Technologies Inc.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ramirez, David
7 Sycamore Lane
Ashford, Kent TN23 3RS / GB
 [2008/38]
Representative(s)Feray, Valérie , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Former [2009/49]Cockayne, Gillian , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2008/38]Cockayne, Gillian , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue
Enfield EN3 7XU / GB
Application number, filing date07251082.915.03.2007
[2008/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1970835
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/24, H04L29/06, H04L29/08
[2008/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/38]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum sicheren Webbrowsen[2008/38]
English:Method and apparatus for secure web browsing[2008/38]
French:Procédé et appareil de navigation web sécurisée[2008/38]
Examination procedure27.03.2007Examination requested  [2008/38]
20.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2010Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.03.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/48]
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/48]
Appeal following examination12.05.2010Appeal received No.  T1899/10
28.07.2010Statement of grounds filed
23.09.2014Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201307   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:10.04.2013
[2013/40]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1376985  (RES IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - SCHEIFLER R W ET AL, "THE X WINDOW SYSTEM", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19860401), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 79 - 109, XP000565891 [X] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/22949.24053