EP1839707 - System for monitoring kinematic motion of a patient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caylor, Edward J., III 14628 Firethorne Path Fort Wayne Indiana, 46814 / US | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251218.9 | 22.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | US20060392001 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: US 392001 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1839707 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63B22/00, // A61B19/00 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
A61B5/1127 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2068 (EP,US);
A61B2090/367 (EP,US);
A61B2090/397 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3983 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B5/1114 (EP,US);
A61B5/112 (EP,US);
A61B5/745 (EP,US);
A63B22/02 (EP,US);
A63B22/0605 (EP,US);
A63B22/0664 (EP,US);
A63B22/203 (EP,US);
A63B2213/00 (EP,US);
A63B2220/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | System zur Überwachung der kinematischen Bewegung eines Patienten | [2007/40] | English: | System for monitoring kinematic motion of a patient | [2007/40] | French: | Système de surveillance de mouvement cinétique d'un patient | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1571581 (SURGICAL NAVIGATION TECH [US]) [Y] 1-3,8-14,17 * paragraphs [0051] , [0072] , [0091] , [0150] - [0153]; figures 1,18,19 *; | [Y]US5662111 (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) [Y] 1-3,8-14,17 * column 6, line 63 - line 67 *; | [A]WO2005084544 (DEPUY INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 16; figure 2 * |