Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1841248

EP1841248 - Communication channel establishing method, communication system and communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd.
2-11-2, Tsurumaki Tama-shi
Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd.
2-11-2, Tsurumaki Tama-shi
Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kimura, Youichi
c/o Mitusmi Electric Co. Ltd. 2-11-2 Tsurumaki, Tama-Shi
Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
02 / Sukegawa, Katsuhiko
c/o Mitusmi Electric Co. Ltd. 2-11-2 Tsurumaki, Tama-Shi
Tokyo 206-8567 / JP
03 / Hiketa, Hitoshi
223-551 Sashiyanagi-Cho, Tenri-Shi
Nara 632-0093 / JP
04 / Seike, Yohko
1-30-32, Rokujo, Nara-Shi
Nara 630-8043 / JP
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Vinsome, Rex Martin , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
12th Floor
Cale Cross House
156 Pilgrim Street
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Vinsome, Rex Martin , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street 156
Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB
Former [2007/46]Vinsome, Rex Martin , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB
Former [2007/40]Rees, Alexander Ellison , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Application number, filing date07251443.330.03.2007
[2007/40]
Priority number, dateJP2006010042631.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006100426
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1841248
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1841248
Date:06.01.2010
[2010/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, H04B1/16, G06Q10/00, H04W24/02, H04W52/44, H04W52/08
[2013/08]
Former International [2007/40]H04Q7/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/36]
Former [2007/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Kommunikationskanalaufbau, Kommunikationssystem und Kommunikationsvorrichtung[2007/40]
English:Communication channel establishing method, communication system and communication apparatus[2007/40]
French:Procédé pour établir un canal de communication, système et appareil de communication[2007/40]
Examination procedure29.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/23]
12.08.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
23.10.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/51]
24.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2013/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005282573  (MAENO KOHTA [JP]) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 3,4 * * page 2, paragraph 0016 - paragraph 0017 * * page 3, paragraph 0044 - page 4, paragraph 0045 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1113690  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 11-16 * * column 1, paragraph 0002 - paragraph 0006 * * column 12, paragraph 0065 - column 16, paragraph 0088 *;
 [A]US2005248456  (BRITTON CHARLES L JR [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 7,8 * * page 9, paragraph 0101 - paragraph 0108 * * page 12, paragraph 134 *;
 [A]US2002119770  (TWITCHELL ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003051080  (MAHANY RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 2 *
by applicantUS2005282573