Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1843603

EP1843603 - Image pickup apparatus, light source estimating apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2014
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.04.2014  [2014/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/41]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashimoto, Yasunari
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / Ohki, Mitsuharu
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)Tyson, Robin Edward
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Tyson, Robin Edward
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2007/41]Tyson, Robin Edward
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date07251466.402.04.2007
[2007/41]
Priority number, dateJP2006010226703.04.2006         Original published format: JP 2006102267
JP2006012472028.04.2006         Original published format: JP 2006124720
[2007/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1843603
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1843603
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/73
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2009/44]
Former [2007/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bildaufnahmevorrichtung, Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Beurteilung von Lichtquellen[2007/41]
English:Image pickup apparatus, light source estimating apparatus and method[2007/41]
French:Appareil de capture d'images, appareil et procédé d'évaluation de la source lumineuse[2007/41]
Examination procedure12.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/41]
28.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/15]
29.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.04.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1583371  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12,14-20 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0073] * [Y] 13;
 [Y]US6952225  (HYODO MANABU [JP], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]US2004095478  (TAKANO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0334] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] *
by applicantJP2000224608
 EP1583371