blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1854421 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1854421



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 147
04.05.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
04.05.2007 Drawings Search / examination 11
04.05.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.05.2007 Description Search / examination 21
04.05.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
04.05.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.09.2007 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
17.10.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.10.2007 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
02.11.2007 Priority document Search / examination 48
02.11.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.11.2007 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
12.06.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
12.06.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 6
12.06.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.07.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
12.01.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.01.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.02.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.02.2009 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
09.06.2009 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
24.06.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.06.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.06.2009 Description Search / examination 11
24.06.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
24.06.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
10.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
30.06.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.06.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 General enquiry Search / examination 1
01.04.2011 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.04.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.04.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
18.10.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.01.2012 Closing of application Search / examination 1
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1