blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1854421


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.02.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  07.03.2012  [2012/10]
12.10.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
16.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.11.2009 Change - representative published on  16.12.2009  [2009/51]
26.06.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.06.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
20.02.2009 Definitive list of designations published on  25.03.2009  [2009/13]
20.02.2009 First examination report
17.02.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
16.02.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.01.2009 Request for examination filed published on  04.03.2009  [2009/10]
13.06.2008 Publication of search report published on  16.07.2008  [2008/29]
12.10.2007 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.11.2007  [2007/46]