Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1854421

EP1854421 - Endoscopic translumenal surgical systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.02.2012
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.03.2012  [2012/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US
[2007/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Cropper, Michael S.
3232 Charter Oak Road
Edgwood Kentucky 41017 / US
02 / Bakos, Gregory J.
6330 Redwood Court
Mason Ohio 45040 / US
03 / Schwemberger, Richard F.
8250 Eagle Creek Road
Cincinnati Ohio 45247 / US
04 / Smith, Richard C.
1493 Greystone Lane
Milford Ohio 45150 / US
 [2007/46]
Representative(s)Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2007/46]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date07251893.904.05.2007
[2007/46]
Priority number, dateUS2006038217308.05.2006         Original published format: US 382173
[2007/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1854421
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1854421
Date:16.07.2008
[2008/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/34, A61B1/313
[2007/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/13]
Former [2007/46]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Endoskopische transluminale chirurgische Systeme[2007/46]
English:Endoscopic translumenal surgical systems[2007/46]
French:Systèmes chirurgicaux transluminaux endoscopiques[2007/46]
Examination procedure12.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/10]
17.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/10]
18.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DY]US5591192  (PRIVITERA SALVATORE [US], et al) [DY] 1-11 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 67 * * column 7, line 18 - column 9, line 2 * * figure 6 *;
 [Y]US5743880  (HLAVKA EDWIN J [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, lines 7-47 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 2 * * column 5, line 31 - column 8, line 45 * * figures 2A-2C,4A *;
 [YA]US2002133188  (O'HEERON PETER T [US], et al) [Y] 7 * page 1, paragraphs 4,5,8 * * page 1, paragraph 17 - page 2, paragraph 18 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,5,6,11;
 [YA]WO2004064899  (CRABTREE JOHN H [US]) [Y] 8 * page 9, paragraph 40 - page 11, paragraph 43 * * page 15, paragraph 56 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 1,4,9-11;
 [A]US2005010237  (NIAZI IMRAN K [US]) [A] 1,2,8,11 * page 2, paragraph 34 - page 3, paragraph 42 * * figures 1,2A,5 *