Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026580

EP2026580 - Video processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  31.07.2009
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - applicantpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2009/47]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
British Telecommunications public limited company
81 Newgate Street
EC1A 7AJ / GB
Representative(s)Sayer, Robert David
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2009/08]
Application number, filing date07252366.512.06.2007
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026580
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Videoverarbeitung[2009/08]
English:Video processing[2009/08]
French:Traitement vidéo[2009/08]
Examination procedure17.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/36]
27.04.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/36]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2004091219  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,10 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,7,9;
 [Y]US2003120802  (KOHNO MICHINARI [JP]) [Y] 2,7 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2005144643  (HAKENBERG ROLF [DE], et al) [Y] 3,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0028] , [0060] *;
 [X]US2002128029  (NISHIKAWA SHOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,10 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US2004132456  (TAKEDA DAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,10 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] *
 [Y]  LOHAN F ET AL, "Integrated system for multimedia delivery over broadband IP networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS IEEE USA, (200208), vol. 48, no. 3, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 564 - 574, XP002450156 [Y] 4 * page 571, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2002.1037042