Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2005819

EP2005819 - Method and apparatus for cooling an animal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
14.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DeLaval Holding AB
Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
[2013/38]
Former [2008/52]For all designated states
DeLaval Holding AB
Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Manneke, Peter
P.O. Box 222
18910 Beit-Hashita / IL
 [2013/14]
Former [2008/52]01 / Manneke, Peter
P.O. Box 222
Beit-Hashita, 18910 / IL
Representative(s)Gray, Helen Mary , et al
ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[2014/40]
Former [2013/28]Hällgren, Christer , et al
DeLaval International AB
Intellectual Property & Legal Support
Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
Former [2008/52]Bennett, Adrian Robert J. , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date07252552.022.06.2007
[2008/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2005819
Date:24.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2005819
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/00
[2008/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/52]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kühlen eines Tieres[2008/52]
English:Method and apparatus for cooling an animal[2008/52]
French:Procédé et appareil de refroidissement d'un animal[2008/52]
Examination procedure24.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/33]
06.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2013Observations by third parties
05.07.2013Fee for grant paid
05.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11166359.7  / EP2380431
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.06.2014  18.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Weverskade 110
3147 PA MAASSLUIS / NL
 [2014/30]
25.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
24.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0986/16
23.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
04.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.05.2010Request for further processing filed
24.05.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
GB22.06.2014
IE22.06.2014
LU22.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
HU23.06.2018
[2019/22]
Former [2016/25]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
GB22.06.2014
IE22.06.2014
LU22.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
Former [2016/16]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
GB22.06.2014
IE22.06.2014
LU22.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
Former [2015/24]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
GB22.06.2014
IE22.06.2014
LU22.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
FR30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
Former [2015/22]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
IE22.06.2014
LU22.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
DE01.01.2015
Former [2015/21]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
IE22.06.2014
LU22.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/20]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU22.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/09]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU22.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/24]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/23]BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/22]BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY19.06.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY19.06.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY19.06.2013
LT18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
Former [2014/09]LT18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
Former [2014/08]LT18.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[DX]WO0110197  (LELY RES HOLDING [CH]; VERBURG CARLO [NL]; LELY ALEXANDER V D [NL]; FR) [DX] 1-33 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 8 *;
 [X]EP1260137  (LELY ENTPR AG [CH]) [X] 1,26,30 * abstract *;
 [X]EP1230851  (LELY ENTPR AG [CH]) [X] 1,26,30 * paragraph [0027] *;
 [X]US6418728  (MONROE JERRY [US]) [X] 1-33 * abstract *;
 [X]WO9804121  (ALFA LAVAL AGRI AB [SE]; BIRK UZI [SE]) [X] 1-33 * abstract *