EP1892194 - A tamper-evident closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obrist Closures Switzerland GmbH Romerstrasse 83 4153 Reinach / CH | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liston, Christopher 15 Ilford Close Luton Bedfordshire LU2 8JT / GB | 02 /
Bardet, Philippe 539 rue des Grillons 69400 Gleize / FR | 03 /
Benoit-Gonin, Claude 233 rue de la Chaire 69460 Odenas / FR | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, Matthew David, et al Bryers Intellectual Property Limited Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent Emersons Green Bristol BS16 7FR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Greenwood, Matthew David, et al K.R. Bryer & Co. 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253128.8 | 09.08.2007 | [2008/09] | Priority number, date | GB20060016612 | 22.08.2006 Original published format: GB 0616612 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1892194 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1892194 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/08, // B65D55/02 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
B65D47/0804 (EP);
B65D47/08 (GB);
B65D47/0857 (EP);
B65D55/02 (GB);
B65D55/024 (EP);
B65D55/06 (GB);
B65D2401/15 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Title | German: | Originalitätsverschluss | [2008/09] | English: | A tamper-evident closure | [2008/09] | French: | Fermeture inviolable | [2008/47] |
Former [2008/09] | Fermeture anti-sabotage | Examination procedure | 22.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10003258.0 / EP2213584 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | EE | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | LT | 23.06.2010 | LV | 23.06.2010 | MT | 23.06.2010 | SE | 23.06.2010 | SI | 23.06.2010 | SK | 23.06.2010 | IE | 09.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | BG | 23.09.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | IS | 23.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/41] | BG | 23.06.2010 | |
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
MT | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
MT | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.08.2010 | ||
IT | 09.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4941592 (KITTERMAN LAWRENCE R [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 15; figure -- * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 2 *; | [XA]WO9611150 (APTARGROUP INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,9 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 6 * * page 7, line 17 - page 12, line 20 * [A] 10; | [XY]US6269986 (GROSS RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 5, line 15 - column 8, line 40; figures 7,11 * [Y] 4,5; | [YA]EP1256522 (LUMSON SPA [IT]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0012] - [0017]; figure -- *[A] 9; | [XY]WO2005058722 (ALCOA CLOSURE SYSTEMS INT INC [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * page 15, lines 20-30; figures 3a-3c * [Y] 10; | [Y]DE102004045511 (SEAQUIST LOEFFLER KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0038]; figures 3,7 * |