EP1965433 - High voltage GaN transistors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states CREE, INC. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Yifeng 528 Fireside Lane Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 02 /
Parikh, Primit 6832 Shadowbrook Drive Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 03 /
Mishra, Umesh 2040 Creekside Drive Montesido, CA 93108 / US | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/39] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/36] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253716.0 | 19.09.2007 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | US20060603427 | 21.11.2006 Original published format: US 603427 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1965433 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1965433 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/778, H01L29/40 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
H01L29/2003 (EP,US);
H01L29/7787 (US);
H01L29/404 (EP,US);
H01L29/66462 (EP,US);
H01L29/7786 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2010/14] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GaN Hochspannungstransistoren | [2008/36] | English: | High voltage GaN transistors | [2008/36] | French: | Transistors à haute tension en GaN | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 26.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2011 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 25.10.2011 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 15.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/10] | 15.01.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/10] | Appeal following examination | 25.05.2016 | Appeal received No. T2358/16 | 08.08.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.01.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP12153917.5 / EP2485262 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005114743 (CREE INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * fig. 12 and corresponding text *; | [X]US2006202272 (WU YIFENG [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * fig. 3, 5-7, 9, 10 and corresponding text *; | [E]EP1901341 (NEC CORP [JP]) [E] 1-12 * fig. 1-3, 5, 6, 11 and corresponding text *; | [E]EP1901342 (NEC CORP [JP]) [E] 1-12 * fig. 3, 5, 6, 11, 13 and corresponding text *; | [A] - CHINI A ET AL, High Breakdown Voltage AlGaN-GaN HEMTs Achieved by Multiple Field Plates, IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, PAGE(S) 161 - 163, (20040401), ISSN 0741-3106, XP011109643 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LED.2004.824845 | [A] - OKAMOTO Y ET AL, "A 149W recessed-gate AlGaN/GaN FP-FET", MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, 2004 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL FORT WORTH, TX, USA JUNE 6-11, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040606), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-8331-9, pages 1351 - 1354, XP010727955 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.2004.1338819 | by applicant | US4946547 | US5192987 | US5200022 | US5210051 | US5236395 | US5290393 | US5296395 | USRE34861E | US5393993 | US5523589 | US5592501 | US5686738 | US5739554 | US6218680 | US6316793 | US2002066908 | US2002167023 | US2003020092 | US6548333 | US2003102482 | US6586781 | US2004012015 | US2004061129 | US2005051796 | US2005051800 | WO2005024909 | US2005173728 | US2005258451 | US2005258450 | US2006019435 | US2006108606 | - The Electrical Engineering Handbook, CRC PRESS, (1997), page 994 | - B. GELMONT; K. KIM; M. SHUR, "Monte Carlo Simulation of Electron Transport in Gallium Nitride", J. APPL. PHYS., (1993), vol. 74, pages 1818 - 18211 | - R. GASKA ET AL., "Electron Transport in AlGaN-GaN Heterostructures Grown on 6H-SiC Substrates", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1998), vol. 72, pages 707 - 709 | - Y.F. WU ET AL., "GaN-Based FETs for Microwave Power Amplification", IEICE TRANS. ELECTRON., (1999), vol. E-82-C, pages 1895 - 1905 | - Y.-F. WU ET AL., "30-W/mm GaN HEMTs by Field Plate Optimization", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, (200403), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 117 - 119 | - M. MICOVIC ET AL., "AlGaN/GaN Heterojunction Field Effect Transistors Grown by Nitrogen Plasma Assisted Molecular Beam Epitaxy", IEEE TRANS. ELECTRON. DEV., (2001), vol. 48, pages 591 - 596 | - GASKA ET AL., "High-Temperature Performance of AlGaN/GaN HFETS on SiC Substrates", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, (1997), vol. 18, pages 492 - 494 | - WU ET AL., "High Al-content AlGaN/GaN HEMTs With Very High Performance", IEDM-1999 DIGEST, (199912), pages 925 - 927 | - LU ET AL., "AlGaN/GaN HEMTs on SiC With Over 100 GHz ft and Low Microwave Noise", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, (200103), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 581 - 585 | - WU ET AL., "High Al- Content AlGaN/GaN MOSFETs for Ultrahigh Performance", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, (1998), vol. 19, pages 50 - 53 | - ZHANG ET AL., IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, (200009), vol. 21, pages 421 - 423 | - KARMALKAR ET AL., IEEE TRANS. ELECTRON DEVICES, (200108), vol. 48, pages 1515 - 1521 | - ANDO ET AL., IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, (200305), vol. 24, pages 289 - 291 | - CHINI ET AL., IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, (200405), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 229 - 231 | - Y-F WU ET AL., IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, (200403), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 117 - 119 |