Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1917916

EP1917916 - Cannulated suture anchor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2010
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2013Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 03.04.2013  [2013/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy Mitek, Inc.
325 Paramount Drive
Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US
[2008/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Cauldwell, Nathan
108 Holcott Drive
Attleboro, MA 02703 / US
02 / Howe, Jonathan
6 Chambers Court
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
03 / Wolf, Eugene
55 Montecito Road
San Rafael, CA 94901 / US
 [2008/19]
Representative(s)Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/19]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date07254115.417.10.2007
[2008/19]
Priority number, dateUS2006055554501.11.2006         Original published format: US 555545
[2008/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1917916
Date:07.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1917916
Date:14.05.2008
[2008/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1917916
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[2008/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/19]
TitleGerman:Kanülierter Nahtanker[2008/19]
English:Cannulated suture anchor[2008/19]
French:Ancrage de sutures à canulation[2008/19]
Examination procedure02.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/46]
03.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.12.2009Fee for grant paid
31.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
TR17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
GR18.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
HU18.08.2010
IE17.10.2010
LU17.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
[2013/14]
Former [2012/47]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
TR17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
GR18.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
HU18.08.2010
IE17.10.2010
IT17.10.2010
LU17.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2012/44]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
GR18.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
HU18.08.2010
IE17.10.2010
IT17.10.2010
LU17.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2012/42]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
GR18.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
HU18.08.2010
IE17.10.2010
IT17.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2012/05]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
GR18.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
IE17.10.2010
IT17.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2012/03]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
GR18.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
IE17.10.2010
IT17.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2011/48]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
GR18.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
IE17.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2011/30]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
GR18.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2011/20]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
GR18.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
Former [2010/45]AT17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
Former [2010/43]AT17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
Former [2010/33]ES28.05.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006099109  (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 2, line 5 - line 15 * * page 24, line 8 - page 25, line 11 * * figures 21,25,26,28,34-37,45,46,75 *;
 [X]US2005283158  (WEST HUGH S JR [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-14 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0040] * * figures 1,2,4 *;
 [X]US5464427  (CURTIS RAYMOND L [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,9-14 * column 2, line 16 - line 33 * * claim 7 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [X]US5707395  (LI LEHMANN K [US]) [X] 1-4,8,11,12 * column 2, line 28 - line 65 * * column 6, line 43 - line 46 * * figures 12,12A,12B *
by applicantWO2006099109