Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1932862

EP1932862 - Phosphorous-containing organic polymer and compositions and processes including same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 26.04.2017  [2017/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rohm and Haas Company
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/25]For all designated states
Rohm and Haas Company
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bohling, James Charles
1904 Stirling Drive
Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US
02 / Gebhard, Matthew Stewart
219 Fox Street
Cary, Illinois 60013 / US
03 / Madle, Thomas Glenn
31 Franklin Avenue
Flourtown, Pennsylvania 19031 / US
04 / Maurice, Alvin Michael
1505 Berkley Way
Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US
05 / Pafford IV, Robert Joseph
2647 Brownsville Road
Langhorne, Pennsylvania 19446 / US
06 / Rohrbach
129 Bucks Road
Perkasie, Pennsylvania 18944 / US
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)McLean, Craig Sutherland , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Former [2008/32]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
Rohm and Haas Europe Services ApS - UK Branch European Patent Department 4th Floor 22 Tudor Street London
EC4Y 0AY / GB
Former [2008/25]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
Rohm and Haas Europe Services ApS - UK Branch European Patent Department 4th Floor, 22 Tudor Street
London EC4Y 0AY / GB
Application number, filing date07254809.212.12.2007
[2008/25]
Priority number, dateUS20060875228P15.12.2006         Original published format: US 875228 P
[2008/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1932862
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:C08F230/02, C08F2/22, C08F30/02, C08F220/06, C08K3/22
[2008/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/09]
Former [2008/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Phosphor enthaltendes organisches Polymer und Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren, die dies enthalten[2008/25]
English:Phosphorous-containing organic polymer and compositions and processes including same[2008/25]
French:Polymère organique contenant du phosphore et compositions et processus l'incorporant[2008/25]
Examination procedure27.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/25]
08.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.09.2012
06.09.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/17]
13.12.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/17]
Appeal following examination04.01.2013Appeal received No.  T0948/13
15.03.2013Statement of grounds filed
13.12.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
13.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP16203302.1
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US6419990  (YUKAWA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 4, lines 33-47; example i * * column 4, lines 13-15 * * column 6, lines 23-27 * * column 8, lines 44-49 *;
 [XY]EP1496091  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-10 * examples 1.1-1.5 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0025] , [0026] , [0038] - [0048] - [0078] , [0079] * * example 3.4 * * examples 1.1-1.5,3.4 * [Y] 1-5,10;
 [Y]US2003144399  (MATTA BRUCE L [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,10 * abstract * * example 1 * * paragraphs [0029] - [0033] * * paragraph [0060] *;
 [Y]US4891401  (HUYBRECHTS JOZEF T [BE], et al) [Y] 1-5,10 * example 1 * * column 2, lines 31-35 * * column 3, lines 26-30 * * abstract *;
 [AP]EP1746137  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [AP] 1-10 * paragraph [0009]; example 1 * * sentences 36,37, paragraph 5 * * example 2 * * examples 14-17 *;
 [A]EP1302515  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0023] , [0024]; examples 1-11 *;
 [A]EP1209191  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025] - [0044]; examples 1.14-1.16 *
by applicantUS6218456
 US6419990
 EP1496091
 US2003144399
 US4891404
 US4325856
 US4654397
 US4814373