EP1930560 - Hydraulic control system for a variable camshaft timing phaser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South, Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | For all designated states JAGUAR CARS LIMITED Abbey Road Whitley Coventry Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South, Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Child, Matthew James 26 Glendower Approach, Heathcote Warwick, CV34 6ET / GB | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Potts, Susan Patricia, et al Ford Motor Company Limited Patent Department 1/445 Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/24] | Farrow, Robert Michael Land Rover, Patent Department 53G 16/4, Banbury Road Gaydon Warwick CV35 0RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07270067.7 | 23.11.2007 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | GB20060024438 | 07.12.2006 Original published format: GB 0624438 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1930560 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1930560 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930560 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/344 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
F01L1/3442 (EP,GB,US);
F01L1/34 (GB);
F16K11/0704 (GB);
F01L2001/34426 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86493 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86895 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2011/18] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Steuersystem für Nockenwellenversteller | [2008/24] | English: | Hydraulic control system for a variable camshaft timing phaser | [2008/24] | French: | Système de commande hydraulique pour déphaseur d'arbre à cames | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 27.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1400661 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006011648 (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | by applicant | US5002023 | US5107804 | US2004055550 |