Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1830222

EP1830222 - Method for the determination of a progressive ophthalmic lens [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/36]Method for the determination of a progressive ophtalmic lens
[2013/34]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.01.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Essilor International
147, rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
[2018/02]
Former [2014/05]For all designated states
ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE)
147, Rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
Former [2007/36]For all designated states
ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE)
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton le Pont / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Guilloux, Cyril, c/o Essilor International
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
02 / De Gaudemaris, Diane, c/o Essilor International
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
03 / Berthezene, Marie-Anne, c/o Essilor International
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
04 / Carimalo, Céline, c/o Essilor International
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
 [2013/38]
Former [2007/36]01 / Guilloux, Cyril Essilor International
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
02 / De Gaudemaris, Diane Essilor International
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
03 / Berthezene, Marie-Anne Essilor International
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
04 / Carimalo, Céline Essilor International
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
Representative(s)August Debouzy
6-8, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/10]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2007/36]Hirsch & Associés
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date07290226.522.02.2007
[2007/36]
Priority number, dateFR2006000181001.03.2006         Original published format: FR 0601810
[2007/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1830222
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1830222
Date:29.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:G02C7/02, G02C7/06, G02C13/00
[2007/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/36]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung einer progressiven ophthalmischen Linse[2007/36]
English:Method for the determination of a progressive ophthalmic lens[2013/34]
French:Procédé pour déterminer une lentille ophtalmique progressive[2007/36]
Former [2007/36]Method for the determination of a progressive ophtalmic lens
Examination procedure05.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/16]
08.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2013Fee for grant paid
17.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.10.2014  03.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Vision GmbH
Turnstrasse 27
73430 Aalen / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/51]
Opponent(s)01  28.10.2014  03.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Vision GmbH
Turnstrasse 27
73430 Aalen / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB
von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
Former [2016/28]
Opponent(s)01  28.10.2014  03.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH
Gartenstrasse 97
73430 Aalen / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB
von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/49]
Opponent(s)01  28.10.2014   
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH
Gartenstrasse 97
73430 Aalen / DE
Opponent's representative
Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
09.12.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.07.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.07.2016
06.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
27.09.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2016
08.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.01.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition03.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0581/17
12.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201206   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2012
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.02.2007
AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
TR29.01.2014
IE22.02.2014
LU22.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU22.02.2007
AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE22.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/29]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE22.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/28]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE22.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/27]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE22.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2016/25]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE22.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2015/24]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE22.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2015/07]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IE22.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/50]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/49]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/46]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT29.01.2014
BE29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/39]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/37]AT29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[DXA]WO9812590  (ESSILOR INT [FR]; BAUDART THIERRY [FR]; BOURDONCLE BERNARD [FR]; LALOU) [DX] 11-13 * page 16, line 4 - page 17, line 24 * [A] 1-10;
 [XA]WO0188601  (ESSILOR INTERNAT [FR]; AHSBAHS FRANCOISE [FR]; LE SAUX GILLES [FR]) [X] 11-13 * page 4, lines 9-24 * [A] 1-10;
 [XA]FR2820516  (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 11-13 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 1 * [A] 1-10