Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025863

EP2025863 - A subsurface formation monitoring system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.07.2010
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.08.2010  [2010/32]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:BG  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HU  IE  IT  LT  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola / VG
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  EE  ES  FI  IS  LI  LU  LV  MC  PT  SE 
PRAD Research and Development N.V.
De Ruyterkade 62
Willemstad, Curacao / AN
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:BG  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HU  IE  IT  LT  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola / VG
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  EE  ES  FI  IS  LI  LU  LV  MC  PT  SE 
PRAD Research and Development N.V.
De Ruyterkade 62
Willemstad, Curacao / AN
Inventor(s)01 / Schmitt, Benoit
18, Impasse de la Saussaye
91300 Massy / FR
02 / Chouzenoux, Christian
33, Rue Du Mont Valerien
92210 St. Cloud / FR
03 / Babour, Kamal
33, Avenue Victor Hugo
91440 Bures sur Yvette / FR
04 / Beguin, Paul
13, Avenue Garreau
92700 Colombes / FR
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Vandermolen, Mathieu
Intellectual Property Department
Etudes & Productions Schlumberger
1, rue Henri Becquerel
B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Vandermolen, Mathieu
Intellectual Property Department Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1, rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
Former [2009/36]Vandermolen, Mathieu
Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1, rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
Former [2009/08]Raybaud, Hélène F. A.
Etudes & Productions Schlumberger 1, rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date07291004.509.08.2007
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025863
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:E21B47/12
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Beobachtung von unterirdischen Formationen[2009/08]
English:A subsurface formation monitoring system and method[2009/08]
French:Système et procédé de surveillance d'une formation sous-marine[2009/08]
Examination procedure09.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/34]
07.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/32]
26.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2003058127  (BABOUR KAMAL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-16,18 * paragraph [0002]; figures 4,6,13 * * sentence 2, paragraph 18 * * sentence L, paragraph 19 * * paragraph [0020] * * sentence 1, paragraph 51 * * sentence 1, paragraph 53 * * paragraphs [0054] , [0055] * * sentence L, paragraph 56 * * paragraphs [0066] , [0081] , [0100] * [Y] 7;
 [Y]WO0165067  (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [Y] 7 * page 7, line 35 - page 8, line 9; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2005124397  (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [A] 9 * figure 17A *;
 [AD]EP1609947  (SERVICE PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGE [FR], et al) [AD] 1-18 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0014] , [0016] , [0023] , [0025] , [0026]; figures 2,3B,4A,4B *;
 [A]US2002036085  (BASS RONALD MARSHALL [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * figure 6 *