Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2034702

EP2034702 - Device for wireless telephone communication comprising a sound reproduction element removably linked to a connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.09.2011
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.10.2011  [2011/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bluetrek Technologies Limited
8/F Tai Yip Building, 141 Thomson Road Wanchai
Hong Kong / HK
[2010/01]
Former [2009/11]For all designated states
Modelabs Technologies Limited
31/F China Online Centre 333 Lockhart Road Wanchai
Hong Kong / HK
Inventor(s)01 / Francois, Damien
79, rue Truffaut
75017 Paris / FR
 [2009/11]
Representative(s)De Souza, Paula , et al
Cabinet Malemont
91 avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2011/09]De Souza, Paula , et al
Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2010/29]Chameroy, Claude , et al
Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2009/11]Kedinger, Jean-Paul , et al
Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date07291065.604.09.2007
[2009/11]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2034702
Date:11.03.2009
Language:FR
[2009/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/05, H04M1/60, H04R1/10
[2009/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/11]
TitleGerman:Drahtlose Telekommunikationsvorrichtung, die ein Tonwiedergabegerät umfasst, das abtrennbar mit einem Anschluss verbunden ist[2009/11]
English:Device for wireless telephone communication comprising a sound reproduction element removably linked to a connector[2009/11]
French:Dispositif de communication téléphonique sans fil comportant un organe de reproduction sonore lié de manière amovible à un connecteur[2009/11]
Examination procedure19.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/32]
27.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2010Fee for grant paid
30.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/40]
20.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007026908  (CHEN YEN-FENG [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0016] - [0020]; figures 1-3,5 *;
 [A]US6359995  (OU JACK [TW]) [A] 1,3 * column A; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US2006025074  (LIANG CHIH-MING [TW], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column A; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]US2007053544  (JHAO YUN-LONG [TW], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0014] - [0030]; figures 1-6 *