Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1903000

EP1903000 - Implantable biocompatible component including an integrated active element such as a sensor for measuring a physiological parameter, electromechanical microsystem or electronic circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, LV
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sorin CRM SAS
Parc d'Affaires NOVEOS
4 avenue Réaumur
92140 Clamart / FR
[2018/44]
Former [2008/13]For all designated states
ELA MEDICAL
98, rue Maurice Arnoux
F-92120 Montrouge / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Dal Molin, Renzo
7 Allée Mozart
92320 Châtillon / FR
02 / Ripart, Alain
17 Rue de la Gruerie
91190 Gif Sur Yvette / FR
 [2008/13]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/38]
Former [2008/13]Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
SEP Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler 14 boulevard Malesherbes
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date07291120.921.09.2007
[2008/13]
Priority number, dateFR2006000836925.09.2006         Original published format: FR 0608369
[2008/13]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1903000
Date:26.03.2008
Language:FR
[2008/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1903000
Date:04.07.2012
Language:FR
[2012/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1903000
Date:18.09.2019
Language:FR
[2019/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:B81B7/00
[2008/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/38]
Former [2008/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Implantierbares biokompatibles Bauteil, das ein aktives integriertes Element wie etwa einen Messfühler für einen physiologischen Parameter, ein elektromechanisches Mikrosystem oder einen elektronischen Schaltkreis umfasst[2008/13]
English:Implantable biocompatible component including an integrated active element such as a sensor for measuring a physiological parameter, electromechanical microsystem or electronic circuit[2008/13]
French:Composant biocompatible implantable incorporant un élément actif intégré tel qu'un capteur de mesure d'un paramètre physiologique, microsystème électromécanique ou circuit électronique[2008/13]
Examination procedure03.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/08]
12.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2019Fee for grant paid
07.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI18.09.2019
LT18.09.2019
LV18.09.2019
SE18.09.2019
BG18.12.2019
GR19.12.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/10]FI18.09.2019
LT18.09.2019
SE18.09.2019
BG18.12.2019
Former [2020/09]FI18.09.2019
LT18.09.2019
Former [2020/08]LT18.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4023562  (HYNECEK JAROSLAV, et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 30 - line 32 * * column 2, line 65 - line 67 * * column 3, line 41 - line 43 * * claim 1 * * figure 2 *;
 [Y]US2003209357  (MARGOMENOS ALEXANDROS [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0024] , [0026] , [0028] - [0031] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2006192272  (RECEVEUR ROGIER [NL], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] *;
 [A]US2006174712  (O'BRIEN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004035461  (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *