Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1916152

EP1916152 - Front-end structure of a vehicle and associated automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2018Change: Appeal number 
22.05.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flex-N-Gate France
18 Bis rue de Verdun
25405 Audincourt / FR
[2018/15]
Former [2017/32]For all designated states
Flex-N-Gate France
6, place de la Madeleine
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2008/18]For all designated states
Faurecia Bloc Avant
2, rue Hennape
92000 Nanterre / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bierjon, Didier
8 rue du Réservoir
25400 Audincourt / FR
 [2008/18]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/50]Domenego, Bertrand , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2008/18]Domenego, Bertrand , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date07291263.716.10.2007
[2008/18]
Priority number, dateFR2006000928223.10.2006         Original published format: FR 0609282
[2008/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1916152
Date:30.04.2008
Language:FR
[2008/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1916152
Date:09.12.2015
Language:FR
[2015/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:B60Q1/04, B62D25/08
[2008/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2015/50]
Former [2009/02]DE,  FR 
Former [2008/18]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorderstruktur eines Kraftfahrzeugs und damit ausgestattetes Kraftfahrzeug[2008/18]
English:Front-end structure of a vehicle and associated automobile[2008/18]
French:Bloc avant de véhicule et véhicule automobile associé[2008/18]
Examination procedure09.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/43]
10.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.12.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
08.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2015Fee for grant paid
30.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.08.2016   
Magna Exteriors GmbH
Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11
63877 Sailauf / DE
Opponent's representative
Zangger, Bernd, et al
Magna International Europe GmbH
Patentabteilung
Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317
8041 Graz / AT
 [2016/38]
19.10.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.02.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
23.03.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.03.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.05.2018Appeal received No.  T1267/18
17.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2007140892  (PEGUFORM GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,4-6 * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 6; figure 1; claim 1 * * page 8, lines 19-25 *;
 [Y]JPH03284481  (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 1-6 * figures 6-9 *;
 [Y]EP1702834  (FAURECIA KUNSTSTOFFE AUTOMOBILSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0004]; figures 1-4; claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO2004085230  (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 9, lines 8-13 - page 9, lines 20-27 *;
 [Y]EP1623873  (FAURECIA BLOC AVANT [FR]) [Y] 1-6 * claim 1 *
by applicantWO2007140892
 JPH03284481
 WO2004085230
 EP1702834
 EP1623873
 EP1232932
OppositionWO2007140892
 JPH03284481
 EP1702834
 WO2004085230
 EP1623873
 DE10237454
 EP1544035
 US2005236827
 WO2006024717
 JP2005178705