Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1916152 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1916152



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 580
22.10.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.09.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.09.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 6
21.09.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.09.2018 Claims Appeal 2
21.09.2018 Description Appeal 6
21.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.09.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
29.05.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.05.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.05.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 15
17.05.2018 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.05.2018 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 33
17.05.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
03.04.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.04.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
23.03.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.03.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 14
23.03.2018 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.03.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Means of redress Opposition 2
23.03.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
23.03.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.03.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.03.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.03.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.03.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.03.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.03.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
27.02.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 1
27.02.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 2
27.02.2018 Request for change of address - applicant Opposition 1
23.01.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
02.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.12.2017 Claims Opposition 2
19.12.2017 Claims Opposition 2
19.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.12.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
24.11.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.11.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
03.07.2017 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 18
20.06.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
09.06.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
10.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.04.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
28.04.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.04.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
15.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
15.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
15.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
15.02.2017 Claims Opposition 2
15.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.02.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
19.10.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.10.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.09.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
05.09.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
31.08.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
23.08.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.08.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
12.08.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
12.08.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
13.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
09.12.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.09.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.06.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.06.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.06.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.06.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
25.03.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 14
17.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
17.04.2009 Description Search / examination 4
17.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
08.04.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
08.04.2009 Description Search / examination 4
08.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.03.2009 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
12.02.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.02.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.02.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.12.2008 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 4
10.10.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.05.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.04.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.02.2008 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
13.02.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.02.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 5
13.02.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
16.10.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
16.10.2007 Description Search / examination 7
16.10.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2007 Drawings Search / examination 3
16.10.2007 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
16.10.2007 Priority document Search / examination 24
16.10.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7